Global patent index - EP 1051558 A1

EP 1051558 A1 2000-11-15 - BLOCKING DEVICE FOR A DOOR PRIVIDED WITH A DOOR CLOSER

Title (en)

BLOCKING DEVICE FOR A DOOR PRIVIDED WITH A DOOR CLOSER

Title (de)

FESTSTELLVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE MIT EINEM TÜRSCHLIESSER VERSEHENE TÜR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE POUR PORTE POURVUE D'UN FERME-PORTE

Publication

EP 1051558 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932418 A

Priority

  • DE 9900246 W
  • DE 19803789 A
  • DE 19901773 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939069A1] The invention relates to a blocking device for a door provided with a door closer (3). A sliding arm (32) is coupled with the end thereof on the door leaf or on the door frame. The other end of the sliding arm is guided with a glider (33) inside a track (4) in a moveable manner, said track being arranged on the door frame or door leaf. The glider (33) interacts with a stop (61) which is arranged in the track (4) and which is pushed in the movement area of the glider (33) by the action of a spring element (6). The stop (61) interacts with an electrically switchable control element (8). According to the invention, the control element (8) comprises a piezo-electric element, a magnetostrictive element, a thermostrictive element, a shape-memory element or a comparable actuator. In order to prevent deviation, the spring element (6) is alternatively supported in or released from a support point by a blocking element (7) which is preferably guided in an axial direction in the track, whereby the blocking element (7) interacts with the control element (8). The movement of the blocking element (7) is blocked in a first position of the control element (8) and, as a result, the spring element (6) is blocked. As a consequence, the glider (33) which is guided in the track (4) can not deflect the stop (61), and the door leaf remains blocked. The movement of the blocking element (7) is permitted in a second position of the control element (8). The action of a recoil spring (9) causes the blocking element (7) to move out of the blocking position thereof and to release the spring element (6). The glider (33) can thus deflect the stop (61) against the force of the spring element (6) and the door leaf closes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/28; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05C 17/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0009 (2013.01); E05B 47/00 (2013.01); E05C 17/28 (2013.01); E05F 2003/228 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/43 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/67 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939069A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939069 A1 19990805; AT 214773 T 20020415; AU 3246999 A 19990816; DE 19980135 D2 20010802; DE 29980014 U1 20010111; EP 1051558 A1 20001115; EP 1051558 B1 20020320

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 214773

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-09-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GEZE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901009

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 214773

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010803

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE