Global Patent Index - EP 1051562 A1

EP 1051562 A1 2000-11-15 - SILENCER WITH A SHUNT RESONATOR

Title (en)

SILENCER WITH A SHUNT RESONATOR

Title (de)

SCHALLDÄMPFER MIT EINEM NEBENSCHLUSSRESONATOR

Title (fr)

SILENCIEUX AVEC RESONATEUR EN DERIVATION

Publication

EP 1051562 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963457 A

Priority

  • DE 19751940 A
  • EP 9807296 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19751940C1] The invention relates to a silencer with a shunt resonator. Said shunt resonator (10) is formed by an outer housing volume which encompasses the sound-conducting channel (1) in a predetermined area. The sound-conducting channel (1) is connected to the shunt resonator (10) by openings (6). The openings in the sound-conducting channel (1) consist of tubular elements (6), preferably in a moulded part (5), extending from the sound-conducting channel (1) into the housing volume of the shunt resonator (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/02 (2006.01); G10K 11/172 (2006.01); F01N 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/006 (2013.01); F01N 1/02 (2013.01); F01N 1/023 (2013.01); G10K 11/172 (2013.01); F01N 2490/155 (2013.01); F01N 2490/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927237A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19751940 C1 19990325; BR 9815023 A 20020430; CA 2311383 A1 19990603; CA 2311383 C 20070515; EP 1051562 A1 20001115; EP 1051562 B1 20020306; ES 2174526 T3 20021101; JP 2001524635 A 20011204; US 6341663 B1 20020129; WO 9927237 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131115

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150327

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131114

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131114

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803310

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131114

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174526 T3

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-06-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803310 20020411

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE