Global patent index - EP 1051581 A1

EP 1051581 A1 2000-11-15 - IMPROVED FLASHLIGHT

Title (en)

IMPROVED FLASHLIGHT

Title (de)

STABLAMPE

Title (fr)

TORCHE ELECTRIQUE AMELIOREE

Publication

EP 1051581 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99904294 A

Priority

  • US 9901659 W
  • US 1307898 A
  • US 10052798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937948A1] A flashlight (10) in accordance with the present invention includes a chamber end cap (30), head assembly (40) and lamp holder assembly. The end cap includes a bowed tripod portion to facilitate standing the flashlight on a flat surface. The head assembly includes a reflector and a lens. In one embodiment of the invention, the head assembly includes an elliptical reflector. In another embodiment, the flashlight having an elliptical reflector is matched with a negative or planar lens. In another embodiment, the head assembly includes a hyperbolic reflector is matched with a positive or planar lens. The flashlight includes electrode connections which prevent the conduction of electrical energy from batteries when improperly aligned within the flashlight. The lamp holder assembly includes a lamp socket having a lamp guide which provides a guide for installing lamp bulb into the lamp socket and also provides a secure position to the lamp bulb. The lamp holder assembly further includes a fluorescent coating or additive which illuminates light in otherwise dark conditions, thereby facilitating lamp replacement in the less than desirable light conditions. The head assembly attached to the chamber which is rotatable relative to the chamber to cause electrical coupling of a lamp and one or more batteries retained by a chamber. The flashlight also includes a spare lamp held secured by the lamp holder assembly until the user of the flashlight rotates the lamp holder assembly to align a spare lamp opening with the spare lamp.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21L 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21L 4/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/04 (2006.01); F21V 9/16 (2006.01); F21V 14/04 (2006.01); F21V 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/047 (2013.01); F21L 4/005 (2013.01); F21V 7/04 (2013.01); F21V 9/16 (2013.01); F21V 14/045 (2013.01); F21V 23/0414 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937948 A1 19990729; AU 2472199 A 19990809; AU 747455 B2 20020516; BR 9907253 A 20010904; CA 2318454 A1 19990729; CA 2318454 C 20080422; CN 1125940 C 20031029; CN 1289398 A 20010328; DE 69931466 D1 20060629; DE 69931466 T2 20060921; DE 69937915 D1 20080214; EP 1051581 A1 20001115; EP 1051581 A4 20030806; EP 1051581 B1 20060524; ES 2267246 T3 20070301; ES 2300077 T3 20080601; HK 1035927 A1 20040716; JP 2002501294 A 20020115; JP 4659211 B2 20110330; NZ 505802 A 20030630; US RE40171 E 20080325

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110127

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110126

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69931466

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110126

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110126

2011-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MAG INSTRUMENT INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100208

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2267246

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69931466

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-06-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2006-05-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2005-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 21L 4/00 A

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-09-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAG INSTRUMENT INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-08-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030624

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT