Global Patent Index - EP 1051584 A1

EP 1051584 A1 2000-11-15 - MOUNT FOR A PROTECTIVE TUBING LAMP

Title (en)

MOUNT FOR A PROTECTIVE TUBING LAMP

Title (de)

HALTERUNG FÜR EINE SCHUTZROHRLEUCHTE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RETENUE POUR LAMPE A TUBE PROTECTEUR

Publication

EP 1051584 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966290 A

Priority

  • DE 29801316 U
  • EP 9808059 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939136A1] The invention relates to a mount for a protective tubing lamp (12), comprising a stationary part (14) which can be fixed to a lid for example, and a moveable part (16) which is detachably fixed to the stationary part (14) in such a way that both parts (14, 16) fix the protective tubing lamp (12) in place.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 2/00 (2016.01); F21V 21/02 (2006.01); F21Y 103/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 2/00 (2013.01); F21V 21/02 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939136A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29801316 U1 19980514; AT 226702 T 20021115; DK 1051584 T3 20030203; EP 1051584 A1 20001115; EP 1051584 B1 20021023; ES 2184355 T3 20030401; US 6447141 B1 20020910; WO 9939136 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180105

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184355 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-02-03 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806079 20021128

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 226702 T 20021115

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020430

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000506

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE