Global Patent Index - EP 1051585 A1

EP 1051585 A1 2000-11-15 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING AN INCINERATOR PLANT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING AN INCINERATOR PLANT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINER VERBRENNUNGSANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE INSTALLATION DE COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 1051585 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914392 A

Priority

  • DE 9900248 W
  • DE 19803715 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939137A1] In order to homogenize an incineration process in an incineration chamber (1) of an incinerator plant, the invention provides that a number of specified values (SW) is determined for the composition of the fuel mixture (B) of an individual burner (2A to 2Z) with the characteristic quantities (Ka, Kp, Kp') characterized by the incinerating process and/or by the incinerator plant. The specified values are determined according to the portion of a reaction product yielded by the burner during the incinerating process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/08; F23N 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/003 (2013.01); F23N 5/082 (2013.01); F23N 2029/16 (2013.01); F23N 2037/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939137A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK GB GR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939137 A1 19990805; AT 229630 T 20021215; AU 3325099 A 19990816; AU 740219 B2 20011101; DK 1051585 T3 20030324; EP 1051585 A1 20001115; EP 1051585 B1 20021211; US 6361310 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-10-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903735

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150114

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-08 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20030400603

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 229630 T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-08-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20111214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20120119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120210

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400603

2003-03-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903735 20030123

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK GB GR LI NL

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229630 T 20021215

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020124

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK GB GR LI NL