Global patent index - EP 1051677 A1

EP 1051677 A1 2000-11-15 - PROGRAMMABLE CONTROLLER COUPLER

Title (en)

PROGRAMMABLE CONTROLLER COUPLER

Title (de)

PROGRAMMIERBARER STEUERUNGKOPPLER

Title (fr)

COUPLEUR D'AUTOMATE PROGRAMMABLE

Publication

EP 1051677 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99958251 A

Priority

  • FR 9903028 W
  • FR 9815788 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2786892A1] The invention concerns a programmable controller coupler connected to an Ethernet network (BE) under the TCP/IP protocol, so as to communicate with various equipment units, characterised in that it implements, in a flash memory, two disc partitions, one serving as disc for the operating system in real time, the other serving as user-disc, both said discs being accessible by means of the FTP protocol on TCP/IP, the password protected user-disc space is used by a HTTP server ensuring protection and security of private data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/46; G05B 19/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/05 (2013.01); G05B 2219/13172 (2013.01); G05B 2219/25265 (2013.01); G05B 2219/34038 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0034862A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2786892 A1 20000609; FR 2786892 B3 20001229; EP 1051677 A1 20001115; US 6567863 B1 20030520; WO 0034862 A1 20000615

INPADOC legal status

2010-02-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090902

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060911

2006-02-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER AUTOMATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE