Global Patent Index - EP 1051695 A1

EP 1051695 A1 2000-11-15 - WARNING DEVICE

Title (en)

WARNING DEVICE

Title (de)

WARNVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ALARME

Publication

EP 1051695 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906605 A

Priority

  • SE 9900088 W
  • SE 9800150 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938134A1] A device (3) is arranged for alarming of a shutter (1) such as a door or window. The shutter (1) is bolted to a frame (2) by means of at least one locking bolt (23). The locking bolt (23) extends between the shutter (1) and the frame (2) via an intermediate air gap (30). The shutter (1) and the frame (2) have an outside (27) that is faced from a room (32) closed by the shutter (1). The device (3) comprises an alarm circuit (16) that bursts when affected by breaking and co-operation of the members that are included in the device (3). The mentioned device (3) is mounted on the outside of the frame (2) and/or the shutter (1) in connection with the longitudinal air gap (30) between the frame (2) and the shutter (1) on the lock side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/02; G08B 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938134A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938134 A1 19990729; AU 2646999 A 19990809; DE 69908090 D1 20030626; EP 1051695 A1 20001115; EP 1051695 B1 20030521; SE 512925 C2 20000605; SE 9800150 D0 19980122; SE 9800150 L 19990820

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040122

2004-05-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-01-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040122

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-08-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030822

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908090 P 20030626

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL