Global Patent Index - EP 1051714 A1

EP 1051714 A1 2000-11-15 - SOFT MAGNETIC NICKEL-IRON ALLOY WITH LOW COERCIVE FIELD STRENGTH, HIGH PERMEABILITY AND IMPROVED RESISTANCE TO CORROSION

Title (en)

SOFT MAGNETIC NICKEL-IRON ALLOY WITH LOW COERCIVE FIELD STRENGTH, HIGH PERMEABILITY AND IMPROVED RESISTANCE TO CORROSION

Title (de)

WEICHMAGNETISCHE NICKEL-EISEN-LEGIERUNG MIT KLEINER KOERZITIVFELDSTÄRKE, HOHER PERMEABILITÄT UND VERBESSERTER KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGKEIT

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE NICKEL-FER MAGNETIQUE MOU A INTENSITE DE CHAMP COERCITIF, A PERMEABILITE PLUS ELEVEE ET A RESISTANCE A LA CORROSION AMELIOREE

Publication

EP 1051714 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906109 A

Priority

  • DE 19803598 A
  • EP 9900066 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19803598C1] The invention relates to a soft magnetic nickel-iron alloy containing 35-65 mass % nickel, one or several of the rare earths cerium, lanthanum, praseodymium or neodymium and the impurities introduced during smelting, the sum of the rare earths being between 0.003 and 0.05 mass %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/147; C21D 8/12; C22C 19/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 7/00 (2006.01); C21D 8/12 (2006.01); C22C 19/03 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); H01F 1/147 (2006.01); H01H 50/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/14708 (2013.01); H01H 50/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939358A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19803598 C1 19990429; AT 211297 T 20020115; CN 1163915 C 20040825; CN 1275238 A 20001129; CZ 20002616 A3 20001115; CZ 301345 B6 20100120; EP 1051714 A1 20001115; EP 1051714 B1 20011219; EP 1051714 B2 20080430; ES 2169597 T3 20020701; ES 2169597 T5 20081101; HU 0003646 A2 20010228; HU 0003646 A3 20010428; HU 222469 B1 20030728; JP 2002502118 A 20020122; JP 2007314885 A 20071206; KR 100384768 B1 20030618; PL 192145 B1 20060929; PL 341568 A1 20010423; PT 1051714 E 20020628; SK 10832000 A3 20010312; SK 285293 B6 20061005; TR 200002190 T2 20001121; TW 418406 B 20010111; WO 9939358 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VDM METALS INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-07-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CICHY, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-ING., DE

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VDM METALS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140526

2014-07-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VDM METALS INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140526

2014-07-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CICHY, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140526

2014-05-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CICHY, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-ING., DE

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OUTOKUMPU VDM GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VDM METALS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VDM METALS INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CICHY, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20130221

2009-01-02 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2008-11-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2008-05-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2008-04-30 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KRUPP VDM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-04-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP VDM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-10-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20020820

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2169597

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-02-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-31

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 211297

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT