Global Patent Index - EP 1051727 A1

EP 1051727 A1 2000-11-15 - DISCHARGE LAMP SOURCES APPARATUS AND METHODS

Title (en)

DISCHARGE LAMP SOURCES APPARATUS AND METHODS

Title (de)

QUELLEN FÜR ENLADUNGSLAMPEN UND VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

SOURCES POUR LAMPE A DECHARGE ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANTS

Publication

EP 1051727 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964297 A

Priority

  • US 9827522 W
  • US 169697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934395A1] A capillary discharge extreme ultraviolet lamp source apparatus and method for extreme ultraviolet microlithography. The capillary source includes a lamp body (306); a bore having electrodes (300), insulators (302) and a discharge plasma region (304).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 35/20; H05G 2/00; H05H 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 35/20 (2006.01); G01J 3/10 (2006.01); G03F 7/20 (2006.01); H01J 61/12 (2006.01); H01J 61/28 (2006.01); H01J 61/30 (2006.01); H05G 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05G 2/003 (2013.01); B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); G01J 3/10 (2013.01); G03F 7/70016 (2013.01); G03F 7/70033 (2013.01); G03F 7/70916 (2013.01); G03F 7/70983 (2013.01); H01J 61/12 (2013.01); H01J 61/28 (2013.01); H01J 61/30 (2013.01); H05G 2/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934395 A1 19990708; AU 1946599 A 19990719; CA 2315740 A1 19990708; CA 2315740 C 20040720; CN 1134043 C 20040107; CN 1306673 A 20010801; EP 1051727 A1 20001115; EP 1051727 A4 20041110; JP 2003518316 A 20030603; US 6031241 A 20000229; US 6188076 B1 20010213

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034597

2007-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061206

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060726

2004-11-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040924

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EUV LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 35/20 A

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05G 2/00 B

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05H 1/24 B

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000721;LT PAYMENT 20000721;LV PAYMENT 20000721;MK PAYMENT 20000721;RO PAYMENT 20000721;SI PAYMENT 20000721