Global Patent Index - EP 1051731 A1

EP 1051731 A1 2000-11-15 - METHOD OF ANALYZING IONS IN AN APPARATUS INCLUDING A TIME OF FLIGHT MASS SPECTROMETER AND A LINEAR ION TRAP

Title (en)

METHOD OF ANALYZING IONS IN AN APPARATUS INCLUDING A TIME OF FLIGHT MASS SPECTROMETER AND A LINEAR ION TRAP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG VON IONEN IN EINEM APPARAT MIT EINEM FLUGZEIT-SPEKTROMETER UND EINER LINEAREN QUADRUPOL-IONENFALLE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ANALYSE D'IONS DANS UN APPAREIL COMPRENANT UN SPECTROMETRE DE MASSE A TEMPS DE VOL ET UN PIEGE A IONS LINEAIRE

Publication

EP 1051731 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98956748 A

Priority

  • CA 9801106 W
  • US 6757097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930350A1] A method of analyzing ions is carried out in a mass spectrometer apparatus comprising an ion source, a linear RF quadrupole and a time of flight mass spectrometer. Ions are generated from the ion source and passed into the linear RF quadrupole. To retain ions within the linear RF quadrupole, potentials are applied to either end of it and it is then operated as an ion trap. Ions of interest are selected in the linear RF quadrupole and unwanted ions are caused to be ejected. Selected ions are then excited and caused to collide with a neutral gas, to cause collision induced dissociation thereof, thereby forming fragment ions for analysis in the time of flight mass spectrometer. The potential of one end of the linear RF quadrupole is then adjusted to pass selected and fragment ions through to the time of flight mass spectrometer. This enables a spectrum of the selected and the fragment ions to be obtained from the time of flight mass spectrometer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 49/40; H01J 49/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/62 (2006.01); H01J 49/40 (2006.01); H01J 49/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/4225 (2013.01); H01J 49/004 (2013.01); H01J 49/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930350A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930350 A1 19990617; AU 1329899 A 19990628; CA 2312806 A1 19990617; DE 69806415 D1 20020808; DE 69806415 T2 20030220; EP 1051731 A1 20001115; EP 1051731 B1 20020703; JP 2001526447 A 20011218

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091203

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091203

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081203

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806415 20020808

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-05-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010809

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE