Global Patent Index - EP 1051808 A1

EP 1051808 A1 2000-11-15 - A CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR REDUCING INTERMODULATION IN A BANDPASS FILTER SYSTEM

Title (en)

A CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR REDUCING INTERMODULATION IN A BANDPASS FILTER SYSTEM

Title (de)

SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM VERRINGERN VON INTERMODULATION IN EINER BANDFILTERANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE L'INTERMODULATION D'UN SYSTEME DE FILTRE PASSE-BANDE

Publication

EP 1051808 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99903156 A

Priority

  • US 9901013 W
  • US 1275598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938267A1] A circuit arrangement that reduces selected intermodulation. The circuit arrangement includes a signal amplifier coupled to a bandpass filter via an electrical path. Signal energy outside the passband is reflected back into the amplifier and causes intermodulation. The electrical path is constructed with a length that reduces intermodulation, where the length is an odd multiple of one-fourth the wavelength of a predetermined frequency in the passband. The length of the electrical path reduces intermodulation because certain signals reflected by the bandpass filter are approximately 180 DEG , or an odd multiple thereof, out of phase. Energy of problematic signals that are near the edge of the passband or in the stopband is reduced, such as third order intermodulation product and pairs of signals that produce third order intermodulation products.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/10; H01P 1/20; H03D 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/20 (2006.01); H03D 9/06 (2006.01); H04B 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/20 (2013.01); H03D 9/06 (2013.01); H04B 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938267A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938267 A1 19990729; AU 2324399 A 19990809; CN 1126275 C 20031029; CN 1289482 A 20010328; DE 69902144 D1 20020822; DE 69902144 T2 20030320; EP 1051808 A1 20001115; EP 1051808 B1 20020717; US 6072824 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902144 20020822

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: REMEC OY

2002-04-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUANG, GUANGHUA

2002-04-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARKONEN, MARKKU

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUANG, GUANGHUA

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARKONEN, MARKKU

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010904

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB