Global Patent Index - EP 1051839 A2

EP 1051839 A2 2000-11-15 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADVANCED TELEVISION SIGNAL ENCODING AND DECODING

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADVANCED TELEVISION SIGNAL ENCODING AND DECODING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG EINES AVANCIERTEN FERNSEHSYSTEM SIGNALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE ET DECODAGE DE SIGNAUX DE TELEVISION EVOLUES

Publication

EP 1051839 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99903316 A

Priority

  • US 9901410 W
  • US 7243698 P
  • US 5442798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938316A2] The specification discloses a method and apparatus for encoding and decoding advanced television signals using standard MPEG-2 compression engines while maintaining the compression efficiency of such compression engines. The architecture provides parallel processing using standard MPEG-2 compression engines in an overlapping arrangement that does not sacrifice compression performance. A video encoder includes plural regional processors for encoding an input stream of video images. Each video image is divided into regions that have overlapping portions, with each processor encoding a particular region of a current video image in the stream. The regional processors each store a reference frame in a local memory based on a prior video image in the stream for use in the motion compensation of the encoding process. A reference frame processor coupled to the plural local memories updates each reference frame with information from reference frames stored in adjacent local memories. The encoded video images are made up of macroblocks and each regional processor includes means for removing certain macroblocks from the encoded video images that correspond to the overlap portions and concatenating the resulting encoded video images with that of other regional processors to provide an output video stream.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/32 (2006.01); G06T 9/00 (2006.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/436 (2014.11); H04N 19/176 (2013.01); H04N 19/43 (2014.11); H04N 19/61 (2014.11)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938316A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938316 A2 19990729; WO 9938316 A3 20000120; AU 2337099 A 19990809; CA 2318272 A1 19990729; EP 1051839 A2 20001115; JP 2002502159 A 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04N 1/00 A, 7H 04N 7/36 B, 7H 04N 7/50 B

2001-07-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MOTION COMPENSATED COMPRESSION OF A DIGITAL TELEVISION SIGNAL

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HU, YENDO

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE