Global Patent Index - EP 1051882 A1

EP 1051882 A1 2000-11-15 - CIRCUIT FOR OPERATING AN LED LUMINOUS SIGNAL

Title (en)

CIRCUIT FOR OPERATING AN LED LUMINOUS SIGNAL

Title (de)

SCHALTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINES LED-LEUCHTZEICHENS

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT SERVANT A FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SIGNAL LUMINEUX A DIODES ELECTROLUMINESCENTES

Publication

EP 1051882 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907277 A

Priority

  • DE 9900180 W
  • DE 19802895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802895A1] The LEDs (LD) form individual functional blocks or several functional blocks (FB1,..) connected in series which can be switched on and off in common by a control point to which they are connected via series resistances (R1,R2). The states of the LEDs are monitored by evaluating their currents. The LED of each block is connected in parallel with the low impedance switching path (D-S) of at least one electronic switch (T), whose control electrode (G) lies at a voltage taken from the series resistance or from a series resistance tapping. The switch is controlled into the high impedance state as soon as the voltage drop at the series resistance or tapping exceeds a predefined value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 33/08; H03K 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 5/18 (2006.01); H05B 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/089 (2013.01); B61L 5/1881 (2013.01); B61L 2207/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938361A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802895 A1 19990722; AT 205997 T 20011015; EP 1051882 A1 20001115; EP 1051882 B1 20010919; NO 20003778 A 20000920; NO 20003778 D0 20000721; NO 325779 B1 20080714; WO 9938361 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140115

2014-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 205997 T

- Effective date: 20140115

2013-11-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900274

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120319

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100115

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100115

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090116

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-09-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900274 20011025

2001-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2001-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 205997 T 20011015

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZIMMERMANN, DIRK

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI