Global Patent Index - EP 1051929 A1

EP 1051929 A1 2000-11-15 - Improved anchorage fitting for drawer front panels

Title (en)

Improved anchorage fitting for drawer front panels

Title (de)

Verbesserte Verbindungseinrichtung für Schubladenfronten von Möbelschubladen

Title (fr)

Ferrure de fixation améliorée pour panneaux frontaux de tiroirs

Publication

EP 1051929 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99109635 A

Priority

EP 99109635 A

Abstract (en)

The connecting device comprises a holding angle (3), a swivel lever (4), a rotatable cam (5) and a horizontal recess (6) in side wall of the drawer. The holding angle is fixed on the front plate and its side arm (8) has a vertical slit (10) for the swi lever allowing the rectangular cam (13) to pass through which in the horizontal position can enter the horizontal recess of the wall whilst in the vertical position it engages in inlet slits (22) of the recess. The rotatable cam (5) has a coaxial neck (16) which can fit into the circular base of the recess of the holding angle, and an eccentric circular section (18) which is mounted with adjustable rotary angle in upper and lower extensions of the base of the recess. The thickness of the side wall and of the arm of the holding angle is set between the walls of the end sections (17, 23) of the rotatable cam.

Abstract (de)

Verbesserte Verbindungseinrichtung für Schubladenfronten bei Möbelschubladen, die durch einen Haltewinkel (3), einen Schwenkhebel (4), einen drehbaren Nocken (5) und eine horizontale Ausnehmung (6) in der Seitenwand (1) der Schublade gebildet ist, wobei der Haltewinkel (3) an der Frontplatte (2) befestigt ist und sein seitlicher Schenkel (8) einen vertikalen Schlitz (10) für den Schwenkhebel (4) aufweist, die den Durchgang des rechteckigen Nockens (13) ermöglicht, der in der horizontalen Position in die horizontale Ausnehmung der Seitenwand (1) eintreten kann, während er in der vertikalen Stellung in Eintrittschlitze (22) der horizontalen Ausnehmung (6) eingreift. Der drehbare Nocken (5) weist einen koaxialen Hals (16), der in den kreisförmigen Boden (11a) der Aussparung (11) des Haltewinkels (3) einsetzbar ist, und einen exzentrischen, kreisförmigen Abschnitt (18) auf, der dreheinstellbar in oberen (21a) und unteren (21b) Verlängerungen des halbkreisförmigen Bodens (21) der Ausnehmung (6) der Seitenwand (1) angeordnet ist. Die Dicke der Seitenwand (1) und des seitlichen Schenkels (8) des Haltewinkels (3) ist zwischen den Wänden der Endabschnitte (17 und 23) des drehbaren Nockens (5) eingesetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/956 (2017.01); A47B 2088/953 (2017.01); A47B 2230/0014 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1051929 A1 20001115; EP 1051929 B1 20030702; DE 59906184 D1 20030807

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120514

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906184

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120514

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120514

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110527

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906184 P 20030807

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010503

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI