Global Patent Index - EP 1051931 A1

EP 1051931 A1 2000-11-15 - Seat bearing with synchronised mechanism

Title (en)

Seat bearing with synchronised mechanism

Title (de)

Sitzteillagerung mit Synchronmechanik

Title (fr)

Support pour siège avec mécanisme synchronisé

Publication

EP 1051931 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110052 A

Priority

DE 29908599 U

Abstract (en)

The synchronous mechanism (10) is positioned between the seat and foot structures. The synchronous mechanism, at the top end a support column (41) of the foot structure has a housing (11) to which are swivel-linked a first swivel arm (12a) with backrest fitment, and a second swivel arm (12b) supporting the support part (21) of the link part (20). The side of the support part of t link part facing away from the synchronous mechanism has an upward curved support surface (23) in the middle of which is a plate (22) supporting the seat (31), swiveling to all sides, and connected by an elastic connecting element.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Sitzteillagerung für eine Sitzvorrichtung beschrieben, bei der eine Synchronmechanik (10) und ein Gelenkteil (20) zwischen einem Sitzaufbau (30) und einem Fußaufbau (40) derart angebracht sind, daß der Sitzaufbau (30) gegenüber dem Fußaufbau (40) in einer ersten Schwenkrichtung entsprechend der Schwenkrichtung der Synchronmechanik (10) und in Bezug auf die Synchronmechanik (10) allseits verschwenkbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 9/00; A47C 1/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01); A47C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/022 (2013.01); A47C 1/024 (2013.01); A47C 9/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2951679 A1 19810702 - NATTERMANN A & CIE [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908599 U1 19990805; EP 1051931 A1 20001115; EP 1051931 B1 20031015

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160704

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WALTER FRESE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LOEFFLER BUEROSITZMOEBEL GMBH,FRITZ SCHNITGER,WALTER FRESE, , DE

- Document: DE 50004049

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRITZ SCHNITGER, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LOEFFLER BUEROSITZMOEBEL GMBH,FRITZ SCHNITGER,WALTER FRESE, , DE

- Document: DE 50004049

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LOEFFLER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LOEFFLER BUEROSITZMOEBEL GMBH,FRITZ SCHNITGER,WALTER FRESE, , DE

- Document: DE 50004049

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHNITGER, FRITZ, DR.MED., DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LOEFFLER BUEROSITZMOEBEL GMBH,FRITZ SCHNITGER,WALTER FRESE, , DE

- Document: DE 50004049

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRESE, WALTER, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LOEFFLER BUEROSITZMOEBEL GMBH,FRITZ SCHNITGER,WALTER FRESE, , DE

- Document: DE 50004049

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHNITGER, FRITZ, DR.MED., DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LOEFFLER BUEROSITZMOEBEL GMBH, 91244 REICHENSCHWAND, DE; SCHNITGER, FRITZ, DR.MED., 82110 GERMERING, DE; FRESE, WALTER, 82152 PLANEGG, DE

- Document: DE 50004049

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LOEFFLER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LOEFFLER BUEROSITZMOEBEL GMBH, 91244 REICHENSCHWAND, DE; SCHNITGER, FRITZ, DR.MED., 82110 GERMERING, DE; FRESE, WALTER, 82152 PLANEGG, DE

- Document: DE 50004049

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRESE, WALTER, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: LOEFFLER BUEROSITZMOEBEL GMBH, 91244 REICHENSCHWAND, DE; SCHNITGER, FRITZ, DR.MED., 82110 GERMERING, DE; FRESE, WALTER, 82152 PLANEGG, DE

- Document: DE 50004049

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004049

- Representative's name: V. BEZOLD & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004049

- Representative's name: V. BEZOLD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE - PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-09-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50004049

- Representative's name: V. BEZOLD & PARTNER, DE

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-04-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031015

2004-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004049 P 20031120

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021007

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB LI NL

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI