Global patent index - EP 1051944 A1

EP 1051944 A1 2000-11-15 - Device for the adjustment in height of the upper rack of a dishwasher

Title (en)

Device for the adjustment in height of the upper rack of a dishwasher

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Höhenverstellung eines oberen Geschirrkorbes in einer Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour changer de position en hauteur un panier superieur de lave vaisselle dans une machine à laver vaiselle

Publication

EP 1051944 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201147 A

Priority

IT MI990939 A

Abstract (en)

The invention has as an object a device for the adjustment in height of the upper rack of a dishwasher. The device comprises two pairs of cross levers (6-7) hinged to each other at a center line (8) that extends in height inside the washing tub along respective side walls of the same. The levers (6-7) have first ends that are suitable for the support of the upper rack (17) and second ends that are controlled to be drawn near and apart from each other by a pair of screw devices (28) that extend horizontally along said side walls of the machine and are provided with control elements (29) that are accessible from the front of the machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/504 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1051944 A1 20001115; EP 1051944 B1 20040922; DE 60013952 D1 20041028; DE 60013952 T2 20051006; IT 1312283 B1 20020410; IT MI990939 A1 20001103

INPADOC legal status

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130329

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130329

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60013952

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130329

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120413

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120319

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-05-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60013952

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010430

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI