Global patent index - EP 1051968 A2

EP 1051968 A2 2000-11-15 - Cosmetic composition containing an aqueous dispersion of a film-forming polymer with an organopolysiloxane

Title (en)

Cosmetic composition containing an aqueous dispersion of a film-forming polymer with an organopolysiloxane

Title (de)

Kosmetische Zubereitung, die eine wässerige Dispersion eines verfilmbaren Polymeren und eines Polysiloxans enthält

Title (fr)

Composition cosmétique comprenant une dispersion aqueuse de polymère filmogène et d'organopolysiloxane

Publication

EP 1051968 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00401054 A

Priority

FR 9905999 A

Abstract (en)

The cosmetic composition comprises aqueous dispersion of film-forming polymer and organo-polysiloxane. Composition comprises aqueous dispersion of film-forming polymer A (0.1-60 wt.%, per dry wt.) and aqueous dispersion of particles of at least partially crosslinked solid elastomeric organo-polysiloxane B (0.5-65 wt.% (per dry wt.), preferably 3-45 wt.% per t wt. of composition). Composition also contains at least one solvent miscible with water, and at least one additive selected from thickeners, perfumes, preservatives, surfactants different to these used in organo-polysiloxanes suspension, oils, waxes, plasticizers, coalescence agents, colorants, fillers, antioxidants and active substances of cosmetic or dermatological type. Independent claims are also included for: (1) process of make-up of keratin matter, comprising application of composition; (2) process of treatment of keratin matter, comprising application of composition; and (3) use of aqueous dispersion of film-forming polymer and aqueous suspension of solid particles of elastomeric organo-polysiloxane, at least partially crosslinked, in cosmetic composition or in preparing topic composition, to form water-resistant film, non-transferable and/or comfortable to use and/or of mat appearance.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet une composition à appliquer sur la peau et les phanères comprenant une dispersion aqueuse de particules de polymère filmogène et une suspension aqueuse de particules d'organopolysiloxane solide élastomérique au moins partiellement réticulé. L'invention concerne aussi un procédé de soin ou de maquillage des matières kératiniques consistant à appliquer la composition sur les matières kératiniques. La composition permet d'obtenir un film présentant une bonne tenue et résistant à l'eau, de bon confort.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48; A61K 7/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/04 (2006.01); A61K 8/14 (2006.01); A61K 8/72 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61K 8/81 (2006.01); A61K 8/87 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/895 (2006.01); A61Q 1/00 (2006.01); A61Q 1/02 (2006.01); A61Q 1/10 (2006.01); A61Q 3/00 (2006.01); A61Q 3/02 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); C08G 77/44 (2006.01); C08L 83/04 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/895 (2013.01); A61K 8/044 (2013.01); A61K 8/731 (2013.01); A61K 8/8147 (2013.01); A61K 8/8176 (2013.01); A61K 8/87 (2013.01); A61K 8/891 (2013.01); A61Q 1/02 (2013.01); A61Q 1/10 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1051968 A2 20001115; EP 1051968 A3 20010124; BR 0006648 A 20010619; CA 2308868 A1 20001111; CN 1274575 A 20001129; FR 2793409 A1 20001117; FR 2793409 B1 20040319; JP 2000355532 A 20001226; US 6306411 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status

2006-12-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060623

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050314

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI