Global Patent Index - EP 1051996 A2

EP 1051996 A2 2000-11-15 - Climbing frame structure

Title (en)

Climbing frame structure

Title (de)

Kletterrahmenstruktur

Title (fr)

Structure de cadre d'escalade

Publication

EP 1051996 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303982 A

Priority

GB 9911130 A

Abstract (en)

A climbing frame structure includes upstanding poles 10 with an interconnecting horizontal beam 11 attached to the poles and having projecting regions 11a of at least one meter in length, and which are braced against the poles 10 with members 14 at an angle of 45 DEG . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 35/00; A63B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1051996 A2 20001115; EP 1051996 A3 20010411; GB 2349832 A 20001115; GB 9911130 D0 19990714

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041201

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI