Global Patent Index - EP 1052020 A1

EP 1052020 A1 2000-11-15 - NEW ARRANGEMENT OF AGITATORS APPLICABLE TO THE MOVEMENT OF HIGH SPECIFIC WEIGHT PRECIPITATION PRODUCTS

Title (en)

NEW ARRANGEMENT OF AGITATORS APPLICABLE TO THE MOVEMENT OF HIGH SPECIFIC WEIGHT PRECIPITATION PRODUCTS

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG EINES RÜHRWERKS FÜR DIE BEWEGUNG AUSFÄLLUNGSPRODUKTE HOHER DICHTE

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU SYSTEME D'AGITATEURS PREVU POUR DES PRODUITS A FORT POIDS SPECIFIQUE EN PRECIPITATION

Publication

EP 1052020 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98963569 A

Priority

  • ES 9800360 W
  • ES 9702732 A

Abstract (en)

A new arrangement of shakers, applicable to the movement of products having a high specific weight of precipitation, consisting of the incorporation in the interior of a tank (1), of two conventional submersible shakers (2) and (2') at the extremities of the tank (1), generating to flows put face to face (3) and (3') on a liquid mass (4), containing in suspension products of a high specific weight of precipitation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03B 9/06; B28C 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/12 (2006.01); B01F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/12 (2013.01); B01F 5/0206 (2013.01); B01F 5/0256 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934928A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934928 A1 19990715; AU 1878899 A 19990726; DE 69811960 D1 20030410; DE 69811960 T2 20031211; EP 1052020 A1 20001115; EP 1052020 B1 20030305; ES 2135349 A1 19991016; ES 2135349 B1 20000501

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2005-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2004-01-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69811960 P 20030410

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL

2003-03-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL