Global Patent Index - EP 1052034 A2

EP 1052034 A2 2000-11-15 - Sheet metal folder, controller and method

Title (en)

Sheet metal folder, controller and method

Title (de)

Blechbiegemaschine, Steuerung und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Machine de cintrage de tôle, dispositif de commande et méthode

Publication

EP 1052034 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00106272 A

Priority

NZ 33479099 A

Abstract (en)

A sheet metal folder includes a movable fold bar, an actuator to move the movable fold bar and a sheet position monitor which monitors the position of the folded portion of a sheet being folded. During folding, a controller moves the fold bar to a first fold position and retreats the fold bar to a position in which the sheet is no longer contacted by the fold bar. The current position of the sheet is then registered. A second fold position is calculated using the difference between the first fold position of the fold bar and the registered position. The fold bar is then moved to the second fold position. The sheet position monitor may involve a detector detecting the presence of a folded part of the sheet against the fold bar, with the current position of the sheet after the fold bar is retreated being registered by registering the position of the fold bar immediately the sheet no longer resides against the fold bar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052034 A2 20001115; EP 1052034 A3 20011031; NZ 503297 A 20001027

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB IT NL

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): GB IT NL

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI