Global patent index - EP 1052038 A2

EP 1052038 A2 2000-11-15 - Punching machine of section bars for roller shutter

Title (en)

Punching machine of section bars for roller shutter

Title (de)

Stanzmaschine für Rolladenprofile

Title (fr)

Presse à poinçonnage pour des profilés d'un volet roulant

Publication

EP 1052038 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00109868 A

Priority

IT BO990247 A

Abstract (en)

A punching machine of section bars for roller shutter includes: moving means (10) of punching means (20) of said section bars to which are kinematically connected stop means (15); feeding means (30) fit to move section bars; indexer means (40) which are kinematically connected in input to the moving means (10) for driving the motion and in output are connected to driving means (50) fit to move the feeding means (30) of the section bars in correspondence of a punching condition in which the punching means (20) punch the section bars according to a preset pitch; fast forward moving means (60) kinematically connected to the driving means (50) and fit to fast move forward the section bars in correspondence of a non-punching condition of the machine (1) in which the section bars move forward along this latter without being punched. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 28/24; B21D 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/24 (2006.01); B21D 43/02 (2006.01); B26D 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/22 (2013.01); B21D 28/243 (2013.01); B21D 43/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052038 A2 20001115; EP 1052038 A3 20020717; IT 1309246 B1 20020116; IT BO990247 A1 20001113; IT BO990247 D0 19990511

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-07 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17P

2003-05-07 [DBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: DBV

2003-05-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030116

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI