Global patent index - EP 1052039 A1

EP 1052039 A1 2000-11-15 - Can lid and method of manufacturing same

Title (en)

Can lid and method of manufacturing same

Title (de)

Dosendeckel sowie Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Couvercle de boîte et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1052039 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00304008 A

Priority

JP 13112199 A

Abstract (en)

A can lid of the fully-open type has a disk-shaped panel (2), a score (3) notched endlessly in a surface of the panel along an outer circumferential edge of the panel, for forming an opening in the panel, and a tab (5) fixed to the panel by a rivet (4). The tab (5) is oriented in a direction lying substantially perpendicularly to an initial tear-off line (7) of the score. A surface of the panel which is concealed from view by the tab is printed with a circular mark (6) indicative of the direction (R) in which the panel has been rolled. The score is notched such that the rolling direction (R) of the panel lies substantially perpendicularly to the initial tear-off (7) line of the score (3). The panel (2) has an auxiliary score (8) defined in the surface thereof near the rivet (4) and positioned across the rivet (4) from the initial tear-off line (7) substantially parallel to the score (3) and separate therefrom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 51/38; B65D 17/28; B65D 17/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/38 (2006.01); B65D 17/28 (2006.01); B65D 17/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/163 (2013.01); B21D 51/383 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052039 A1 20001115

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040323

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031112

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI