Global Patent Index - EP 1052043 A2

EP 1052043 A2 2000-11-15 - Silicon steel plate and method for producing the same

Title (en)

Silicon steel plate and method for producing the same

Title (de)

Silizium-Stahlblech und Verfahren zur Herstellung dieses Bleches

Title (fr)

Plaque d'acier au silicium et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1052043 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00109188 A

Priority

  • JP 12925099 A
  • JP 37235199 A
  • JP 2000035402 A
  • JP 2000035435 A

Abstract (en)

A silicon steel plate excellent in magnetic properties, workability, flatness, punching quality and the like is produced easily even in a case of high Si content as much as 12 wt%, through ÄAÜ powder mixing process using iron powder and Fe-Si alloy powder, ÄBÜ powder rolling process for forming the mixture into sheet metal, ÄCÜ sintering process, ÄDÜ cold rolling process, ÄEÜ diffusion annealing process, and ÄFÜ finish rolling process for subjecting the sintered, cold-rolled and annealed sheet metal to skin pass rolling. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 3/18; B22F 3/24; B22F 7/08; C22C 1/04; C22C 38/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/18 (2006.01); C22C 38/02 (2006.01); H01F 1/147 (2006.01); C21D 8/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/14783 (2013.01); B22F 3/18 (2013.01); C22C 38/02 (2013.01); B22F 2003/248 (2013.01); C21D 8/1227 (2013.01); C21D 8/1233 (2013.01); C21D 8/1238 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052043 A2 20001115; EP 1052043 A3 20020410

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021203

2003-02-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 22F 3/18 A, 7B 22F 3/24 B, 7B 22F 7/08 B, 7C 22C 1/04 B, 7C 22C 38/02 B, 7C 22C 33/02 B

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI