Global Patent Index - EP 1052073 A2

EP 1052073 A2 2000-11-15 - A disc type panel saw machine with a drive system for the side reference elements

Title (en)

A disc type panel saw machine with a drive system for the side reference elements

Title (de)

Plattensäge mit Antriebsvorrichtung für Anschläge in seitlicher und paralleler Anordnung zur Sägeblattebene

Title (fr)

Scie à panneaux avec système d'entraînement de butées disposés latéralement et parallèlement par rapport au plan de la lame de scie

Publication

EP 1052073 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830333 A

Priority

IT RN990014 U

Abstract (en)

In a disc type panel saw machine comprising a bed (4), a mobile carriage (2), a fixed table (3), a disc saw blade (5) and a side referencing stop (6) for the panel (1) where the stop is attached to a support (7) driven by a kinematic chain (9) with a motor (10), the kinematic chain (9) consists of a system for transmitting motion between at least two co-planar pulleys (P1, P2), and a flexible element (14) such as a cable, belt or chain placed around the pulleys (P1, P2), where the support (7) is coupled with the element (14) and the motor (10) is coupled with the drive pulley (P1) and where the kinematic chain (9) comprises mechanical means for limiting the transmitted force. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27B 27/10; B27B 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 27/02 (2006.01); B27B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 27/02 (2013.01); B27B 27/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052073 A2 20001115; EP 1052073 A3 20040121; IT 248719 Y1 20030212; IT RN990014 U1 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041123

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040316

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI