Global Patent Index - EP 1052093 A2

EP 1052093 A2 2000-11-15 - Electric drive for positioning one or more adjustable elements in a machine; driving device with an angle indicator and printing machine

Title (en)

Electric drive for positioning one or more adjustable elements in a machine; driving device with an angle indicator and printing machine

Title (de)

Elektrisches Antriebssystem zur Vorstellung von einem oder mehreren dreh- und/oder verschwenkbaren Funktionsteilen in Geräten und Maschinen, Antriebsordnung mit einem Winkellagegeber und Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'entraînement électrique pour le positionnement d'un ou plusieurs éléments ajustables dans des machines; dispositif d'entraînement avec indicateur d'angle et machine d'impression

Publication

EP 1052093 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116859 A

Priority

EP 94111516 A

Abstract (en)

The system contains an electric motor (F,G) whose rotor (F) is designed for stiff direct connection to the functional part (D,D1-D4). One or more angular position transducers (44,46) detect the angular motion of the rotor and/or functional parts. A signal processing module (51) receives the transducer signals as actual angular position values and compares them with de values. The signal processor drives the electric motor via a power amplifier (47,48) . The rotor can be integrated with the functio part and/or made in one piece with it.

Abstract (de)

Elektrisches Antriebssystem zur Verstellung von mehreren dreh- und/oder verschwenkbaren Funktionsteilen von Geräten und Maschinen, insbesondere von Druckmaschinen, in ihrer Winkellage, mit mehreren Elektromotoren, deren jeweiliger Rotor zur steifen und direkten Verbindung mit dem Funktionsteil ausgebildet ist, mit mehreren Winkellagegebern, die Winkelbewegungen des jeweiligen Elektromotor-Rotors und/oder Funktionsteiles aufnehmen, mit einem Signalverarbeitungsmodul, das eingangsseitig zur Aufnahme der Winkellagesignale als Istwerte mit den Winkellagegebern verbunden ist und mehrere, je einem Funktionsteil zugeordnete Regler oder Reihen mit mehreren Regelgliedern aufweist, die zur simultanen Aufnahme von je einem Funktionsteil zugeordneten Sollwerten und zu deren Vergleich mit den Istwerten ausgebildet sind, und mit mehreren, vom Signalverarbeitungsmodul und/oder den jeweiligen Reglern kontrollierte Leistungsverstärkern, die ausgangsseitig mit dem jeweiligen Elektromotor zu dessen Ansteuerung verbunden sind durch: (a) einen bidirektionalen Systembus, über den mehrere, jeweils die Regler oder Reihen von Regelgliedern enthaltende Signalverarbeitungsmodule mit einem Prozessor zur Sollwertgenerierung verbunden sind, (b) wobei die Regler oder Regelglieder zur simultanen Aufnahme von je einem Funktionsteil zugeordneten Sollwerten ausgebildet sind, (c) und einen Lokalbus, über den die Regler oder Reihen mit mehreren Regelgliedern des Signalverarbeitungsmoduls mit Achsperipheriemodulen als Schnittstellen zu den Leistungsblöcken der Elektromotoren und zu den Winkellagegebern verbunden sind.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/004 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/0045 (2013.01); B41P 2213/734 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052093 A2 20001115; EP 1052093 A3 20010207; EP 1052093 B1 20030226; EP 1052093 B2 20090107; AT 233181 T 20030315; DE 59410218 D1 20030116; DE 59410249 D1 20030403; ES 2183823 T3 20030401; ES 2183823 T5 20100415; ES 2189716 T3 20030716; ES 2189716 T5 20090601

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130724

2014-08-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 233181

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110706

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-12-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-06-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2009-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2009-01-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20090107

2009-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070723

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070723

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-07-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060703

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-01-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2189716

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59410249

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-02-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0693374

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41F 13/004 A

2000-11-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 693374

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI