Global Patent Index - EP 1052093 A3

EP 1052093 A3 2001-02-07 - Electric drive for positioning one or more adjustable elements in a machine; driving device with an angle indicator and printing machine

Title (en)

Electric drive for positioning one or more adjustable elements in a machine; driving device with an angle indicator and printing machine

Title (de)

Elektrisches Antriebssystem zur Vorstellung von einem oder mehreren dreh- und/oder verschwenkbaren Funktionsteilen in Geräten und Maschinen, Antriebsordnung mit einem Winkellagegeber und Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'entraînement électrique pour le positionnement d'un ou plusieurs éléments ajustables dans des machines; dispositif d'entraînement avec indicateur d'angle et machine d'impression

Publication

EP 1052093 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00116859 A

Priority

EP 94111516 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052093A2] The system contains an electric motor (F,G) whose rotor (F) is designed for stiff direct connection to the functional part (D,D1-D4). One or more angular position transducers (44,46) detect the angular motion of the rotor and/or functional parts. A signal processing module (51) receives the transducer signals as actual angular position values and compares them with de values. The signal processor drives the electric motor via a power amplifier (47,48) . The rotor can be integrated with the functio part and/or made in one piece with it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/004

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/004 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/0045 (2013.01); B41P 2213/734 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052093 A2 20001115; EP 1052093 A3 20010207; EP 1052093 B1 20030226; EP 1052093 B2 20090107; AT 233181 T 20030315; DE 59410218 D1 20030116; DE 59410249 D1 20030403; ES 2183823 T3 20030401; ES 2183823 T5 20100415; ES 2189716 T3 20030716; ES 2189716 T5 20090601

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130724

2014-08-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 233181 T

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110706

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-12-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-06-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2009-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2009-01-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090107

2009-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070723

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070723

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-07-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060703

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-01-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189716 T3

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59410249 P 20030403

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-02-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0693374 P

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 13/004 A

2000-11-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 693374

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI