Global Patent Index - EP 1052116 A3

EP 1052116 A3 2001-02-28 - Decorative material

Title (en)

Decorative material

Title (de)

Dekoratives Material

Title (fr)

Matériau décoratif

Publication

EP 1052116 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00110057 A

Priority

JP 13072899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052116A2] There is provided a decorative material that gives the impression of unevenness due to the differences in gloss of a film formed on the surface of the decorative material. This decorative material is excellent in solvent resistance; a pattern formed on it is not easily erased even when the decorative material is wiped with cloth or the like impregnated with a solvent. Such a decorative material can be produced in the following manner: a coloring layer 3 and a pattern layer 4 are formed on the surface of a substrate 2 in the order mentioned; and, before forming a surface-protective layer 7 by the use of an ionizing radiation hardening resin composition, a coating layer 5 capable of preventing the penetration of the ionizing radiation hardening resin composition into the underlying layers is formed on the pattern layer 4 by using a hardening resin, and a highly permeable pattern layer 6 having permeability for the ionizing radiation hardening resin composition higher than that of the underlying coating layer 5 is provided on top of the coating layer 5 by the use of a hardening resin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 5/04; B41M 3/06; B41M 7/00; B44F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 33/00 (2006.01); B41M 3/06 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); B44C 5/04 (2006.01); B44F 9/02 (2006.01); D21H 19/24 (2006.01); D21H 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 5/0438 (2013.01); B41M 3/06 (2013.01); B41M 7/0045 (2013.01); B41M 7/0072 (2013.01); B44C 5/04 (2013.01); B44C 5/043 (2013.01); B44F 9/02 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24355 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24612 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24876 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24893 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052116 A2 20001115; EP 1052116 A3 20010228; EP 1052116 B1 20031126; DE 60006739 D1 20040108; DE 60006739 T2 20040923; JP 2000328498 A 20001128; JP 4268261 B2 20090527; US 6428875 B1 20020806

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-08-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60006739 P 20040108

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI