Global Patent Index - EP 1052154 A1

EP 1052154 A1 2000-11-15 - Carriage, especially railway vehicle

Title (en)

Carriage, especially railway vehicle

Title (de)

Wagen, insbesondere Schienenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Caisse équipée de véhicule notamment ferroviaire

Publication

EP 1052154 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401301 A

Priority

FR 9906167 A

Abstract (en)

The bodywork for a railway wagon has a chassis with a bogie and suspension and couplings. The bogie has a load traverse on w a part (A) of the chassis is in contact., the secondary suspension and the linkages. The chassis part has a welded structure wit sections (1,2,7,8) assembled without the load traverse.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une caisse équipée de véhicule, comportant un châssis et au moins un bogie sur lequel une partie (A) du châssis est en appui et auquel elle est reliée par des moyens d'appui et de liaison comprenant notamment une traverse de charge, des suspensions secondaires, un pivot et des dispositifs à bielle. Selon l'invention, le bogie comprend la traverse de charge, sur laquelle ladite partie (A) du châssis est en appui, les suspensions secondaires, le pivot et les dispositifs à bielles, et ladite partie (A) du châssis présente une structure mécano-soudée comportant des pièces (1, 2, 7, 8) assemblées ne comprenant pas de traverse de charge. Une telle caisse est utilisable pour la construction de véhicules destinés à constituer des rames ferroviaires. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052154 A1 20001115; EP 1052154 B1 20040825; AT 274432 T 20040915; DE 60013202 D1 20040930; DE 60013202 T2 20050811; DK 1052154 T3 20050103; ES 2226736 T3 20050401; FR 2793465 A1 20001117; FR 2793465 B1 20010810; NO 20002493 A 20001115; NO 20002493 D0 20000512; NO 322634 B1 20061106; PT 1052154 E 20041231

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160509

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE , CH

2014-05-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60013202

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140416

2014-05-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60013202

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LAVOIX MUNICH, DE

- Effective date: 20140416

2014-04-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60013202

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LAVOIX MUNICH, DE

2014-03-05 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20140226

2014-02-28 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20140217

2014-02-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140123 AND 20140129

2014-02-17 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-02-10 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20140130

2014-02-06 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20140130

2013-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2013-12-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-12 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2226736

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-01-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041027

2004-12-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-12-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60013202

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-08-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040825

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI