Global Patent Index - EP 1052155 A1

EP 1052155 A1 2000-11-15 - Railway vehicle

Title (en)

Railway vehicle

Title (de)

Schienenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Véhicule ferroviaire

Publication

EP 1052155 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109964 A

Priority

  • DE 19921683 A
  • DE 19923687 A

Abstract (en)

The railway vehicle has units joined together to form a train, each with at least two bogie axles with at least two running wheels and motive drives. The running wheels of each bogie axle are independent individual wheels with their own drives. Some un have tilt control arrangements dependent on at least one sensor signal, e.g. for the radius of a bend and/or the vehicle speed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine neuartige Ausbildung eines Schienenfahrzeugs bestehend aus mehreren gelenkig miteinander zu einem Zug verbundenen Einheiten, die jeweils wenigstens zwei Fahrwerkachsen mit jeweils zwei Laufrädern sowie Fahrantriebe aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 3/16; B61C 17/04; B61F 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 17/04 (2006.01); B61D 3/10 (2006.01); B61F 3/16 (2006.01); B61F 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61C 17/04 (2013.01); B61D 3/10 (2013.01); B61F 3/16 (2013.01); B61F 5/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052155 A1 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030117

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI