Global Patent Index - EP 1052157 A2

EP 1052157 A2 2000-11-15 - Electrical connecting device for automatic railway couplings

Title (en)

Electrical connecting device for automatic railway couplings

Title (de)

Elektrokupplung für eine automatische Zugkupplung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion électrique pour attelages automatiques des véhicules ferroviaires

Publication

EP 1052157 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109878 A

Priority

DE 19921611 A

Abstract (en)

The coupling has a centring device (10) with baffle surfaces (30), a locking and release device for coupling and decoupling an electric coupling (104) with a number of plug contacts and a protective plate (102). The centring device has an actuator with arrangement at least for actuating the protective plate mounted on the centring device so that the plate can be moved from a fir position in which the plug contacting device is covered to a second position in which it is exposed when the locking devices of coupled centring devices are engaged. Independent claims are also included for an automatic traction coupling, for a method of coupling an electric coupling and a method of releasing an electric coupling.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Elektrokuppeleinrichtung (1) für eine automatische Zugkupplung umfassend eine Zentriervorrichtung (10) mit Prallfläche (30); einer Arretier- und Löseeinrichtung zum Kuppeln und Entkuppeln; eine Elektrokupplung, die eine Vielzahl von Stiftkontakteinrichtungen (104) sowie eine Schutzplatte (102) umfaßt. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Zentriervorrichtung (10) eine Betätigungseinrichtung mit Mitteln wenigstens zur Betätigung der Schutzplatte (102) umfaßt, die derart an der Zentriereinrichtung (10) angeordnet ist, daß die Schutzplatte (102) aus einer ersten Stellung, in der die Steckkontakteinrichtungen (104) abgedeckt sind, in eine zweite Stellung in der die Steckkontakteinrichtungen (104) freigegeben sind, verbracht wird, wenn die Arretiervorrichtungen der miteinander kuppelnden Zentriervorrichtungen (10) ineinander einrasten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61G 5/10; B61G 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 5/06 (2006.01); B61G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 5/10 (2013.01); B61G 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052157 A2 20001115; EP 1052157 A3 20010221; EP 1052157 B1 20040303; DE 19921611 A1 20001123; EP 1375291 A1 20040102; EP 1375291 B1 20050427

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2006-07-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060725

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-02-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-06-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005475 P 20040408

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI