Global Patent Index - EP 1052176 A1

EP 1052176 A1 2000-11-15 - Governing device for the rotation of containers

Title (en)

Governing device for the rotation of containers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Drehbewegung von Gefässen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pilotage pour la rotation de conteneurs

Publication

EP 1052176 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106501 A

Priority

DE 29908827 U

Abstract (en)

During a packaging operation a round container is rotated (3) under control during the application of an adhesive label. The position of the container and its rotational path is controlled by a detachable cam profile (1). The cam (1) is fixed (32, 34, 3 during label application.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Drehbewegung von Gefäßen (10) mit einem an einer Antriebswelle (2) befestigten, gegenüber einem feststehenden Rahmen drehbaren Transportkarussell (3), in dessen Randbereich konzentrisch zur Drehachse der Antriebswelle eine Anzahl drehbar gelagerter Drehteller (4) vorgesehen ist, einer Zentriereinrichtung über jedem der Drehteller (4), mittels derer ein Gefäß zwischen einem Drehteller (4) und der zugehörigen Zentriereinrichtung einspannbar ist, einer bezüglich des feststehenden Rahmens verdrehfesten Steuerkurve (7), einer Führungseinrichtung (5) an jedem Drehteller (4), die dazu ausgestaltet ist, an der Steuerkurve (7) abzurollen, um den Drehteller (4) bei der Drehung des Tansportkarussells (3) gegenüber der Steuerkurve (7) in einer durch die Form der Steuerkurve vorgegebenen Weise bezüglich des Transportkarussells (3) zu verdrehen, wobei die Steuerkurve (7) außen am Umlaufweg der Führungseinrichtungen (5) liegt und entlang des Umfangs in Segmente unterteilt ist, die aus ihrer Halterung lösbar sind. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Steuerkurvensegmente an einem Kurventräger (1) lösbar gehalten sind, der bezüglich des feststehenden Rahmens drehbar um die Drehachse des Transportkarussells (3) gelagert ist, und daß eine Feststeileinrichtung (32, 34, 38) vorhanden ist, mit der der Kurventräger (1) gegen Verdrehungen um die Drehachse des Transportkarussells (3) lösbar festgesetzt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/045 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1771 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908827 U1 20001005; DE 50012628 D1 20060601; EP 1052176 A1 20001115; EP 1052176 B1 20060426; US 6439368 B1 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111122

2007-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070129

2006-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012628 P 20060601

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-04-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KHS AG

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040113

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI