Global Patent Index - EP 1052183 A1

EP 1052183 A1 2000-11-15 - Tamper-indicating means for a container

Title (en)

Tamper-indicating means for a container

Title (de)

Originalitätsvorrichtung für einen Behälter

Title (fr)

Moyens de garantie pour un récipient

Publication

EP 1052183 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00610043 A

Priority

DE 29908053 U

Abstract (en)

A container (1) having an upwards facing opening with a surrounding edge and flange (10) means arranged in the vicinity of the container edge, said flange means adapted to cooperate with a lid (40), said lid having an edge which can engage said flange means to provide a closed container. The container comprises at least one tool arranged at the container edge and comprising a lid-engaging surface for releasing the lid when mounted on the container, said tool comprising a bracket (20) hinged to the container, the bracket being arranged such that a pivot movement outwards from the container results in the lid-engaging surface being moved outwards thereby lifting the edge of the lid outwards in the region of the tool when the lid is mounted, thus facilitating opening of the container, and a tamper-indicating means for indicating that the bracket has been pivoted outwards. The tamper-indicating means comprises an indicator member (30) arranged to cover at least a portion of the bracket in a non-engaging manner, said indicator member being attached to said container and configured to break or deform when the bracket is moved outwards. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/0212 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0023 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00092 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00518 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00555 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00629 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00685 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0074 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00796 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00944 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908053 U1 19991007; AT 254074 T 20031115; DK 1052183 T3 20040308; EP 1052183 A1 20001115; EP 1052183 B1 20031112; ES 2209795 T3 20040701; PT 1052183 E 20040331

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SUPERFOS A/S

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-08-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-02-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-27 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-12-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SUPERFOS A/S

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-11-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-05-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-05-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-05-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-05-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209795 T3

2004-05-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-05-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040517

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-05-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040513

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-05-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040512

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-05-12 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040512

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-05-12 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040512

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-28 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-06 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20040406

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040113

2004-03-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-03-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040400022

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60006444 P 20031218

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000511;LT PAYMENT 20000511;LV PAYMENT 20000511;MK PAYMENT 20000511;RO PAYMENT 20000511;SI PAYMENT 20000511

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000511;LT PAYMENT 20000511;LV PAYMENT 20000511;MK PAYMENT 20000511;RO PAYMENT 20000511;SI PAYMENT 20000511