Global Patent Index - EP 1052185 A1

EP 1052185 A1 2000-11-15 - Tear open container

Title (en)

Tear open container

Title (de)

Verpackung mit Aufreissverschluss

Title (fr)

Récipient déchirable

Publication

EP 1052185 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810394 A

Priority

EP 99810394 A

Abstract (en)

The packet has at least in the opening area superposed layers of wrapping material which form an outer (20) and inner (22) packet part and which can be detached from each other. The tear-off aid which can be perforations, notches or weak lines is arranged on outer packet part so that the latter can be separated from the inner packet part at a distance (a) from the opening (34) and the inner packet part becomes exposed in the opening area. The inner packet part can be a tubular or hose like insert connected outside of the opening area to the outer packet part.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Verpackung (10) mit einem eine Öffnung (34) zur Entnahme eines Füllgutes (32) freigebenden Aufreissverschluss mit einer Aufreisshilfe weist die Verpackung zumindest im Öffnungsbereich übereinanderliegende, voneinander gelöste oder lösbare, einen äusseren (20) und einen inneren Verpackungsteil (22) bildende Lagen von Verpackungsmaterial auf. Die Aufreisshilfe ist am äusseren Verpackungsteil (20) so angeordnet, dass der äussere Verpakkungsteil vom inneren Verpackungsteil in einem Abstand (a) zur Öffnung getrennt und im Öffnungsbereich der innere Verpackungsteil freigelegt wird. Der beim Aufreissen der Verpackung freigelegte innere Verpackungsteil (22) ist keimfrei, so dass sich die Verpackung zur Einnahme von trink- und/oder essbaren Füllgütern aus der Verpackung direkt in den Mund eignet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/40 (2006.01); B65D 75/38 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 75/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/38 (2013.01); B65D 75/5805 (2013.01); Y10S 383/904 (2013.01); Y10S 383/906 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052185 A1 20001115; EP 1052185 B1 20030326; CA 2307368 A1 20001106; CA 2307368 C 20050419; DE 59904727 D1 20030430; ES 2192371 T3 20031001; US 6391353 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180501

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180601

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-05-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140506

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192371 T3

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904727 P 20030430

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020107

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-08-22 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2001-08-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010515

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI