Global Patent Index - EP 1052200 A1

EP 1052200 A1 2000-11-15 - Apparatus for automatically forming arrays of containers

Title (en)

Apparatus for automatically forming arrays of containers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur automatisierten Bildung von Behälter-Gruppen

Title (fr)

Appareil a former automatiquement des groupes de conteneurs

Publication

EP 1052200 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99201452 A

Priority

EP 99201452 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for forming arrays of containers (1) supplied by means of a feeder belt (10; 210), comprising means (26;126;226;326) for receiving the containers, which are integral with associated support elements (21), said support elements (21) being displaced from a receiving zone to a zone for releasing the rows of containers (1) by means of associated actuating devices (23,24,25). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 47/08; B65B 35/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/40 (2006.01); B65G 47/08 (2006.01); B65G 47/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65G 47/084 (2013.01); B65B 35/405 (2013.01); B65G 47/841 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052200 A1 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030408

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020926

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010509

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI