Global Patent Index - EP 1052207 A1

EP 1052207 A1 2000-11-15 - Device for separating flat mail objects

Title (en)

Device for separating flat mail objects

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Vereinzeln von flachen Sendungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour séparer des objets postaux plats

Publication

EP 1052207 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810419 A

Priority

EP 99810419 A

Abstract (en)

The letters are stacked against a vertical stop face (3) and are moved to a delivery belt (15) supported on a lower edge by support face (6) which has a preferably ribbed area (21) which seizes the letters (10) on their way to the delivery belt plane t spread them out across the transport direction of the conveyor (5). The area can form the top side of a wedge which rises in the transport direction of the conveyor.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung dient zum Vereinzeln von flachen Sendungen, die stapelweise an einer einen Abzugsspalt (11) aufweisenden vertikalen Anschlagfläche (3) ausgerichtet und mittels eines Fördermittels (5) zu einem Abzugsband (15) transportiert werden. Das Abzugsband (15) weist Saugöffnungen (9) auf, die durch Reibung und Saugluft auf die jeweils abzuziehenden Sendungen (10a) im wesentlichen horizontal und quer zur Bewegungsrichtung (7) eines Fördermittels (5) einwirken. Eine Auflagefläche (6) weist einen Bereich (21) auf, der die Sendungen (10) auf ihrem Weg zur Abzugsbandebene (8) jeweils an der unteren Kante (12) erfasst und gegenseitig verschiebt oder auffächert. Durch das Auffächern der Sendungen werden Mitreisskräfte verkleinert und es können Doppelabzugsfehler vermieden werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/12; B65H 1/24; B65H 3/48; B65H 3/60; B65H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/24 (2006.01); B65H 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/124 (2013.01); B65H 1/24 (2013.01); B65H 2301/321 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0854103 A1 19980722 - GRAPHA HOLDING AG [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052207 A1 20001115; EP 1052207 B1 20030820; AT 247590 T 20030915; DE 59906676 D1 20030925

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080511

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080511

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080511

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070508

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040511

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906676 P 20030925

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020827

2001-10-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010319

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI