Global Patent Index - EP 1052209 A1

EP 1052209 A1 2000-11-15 - Foil cutting assembly, in particular for a wrapping machine

Title (en)

Foil cutting assembly, in particular for a wrapping machine

Title (de)

Folienschneideinrichtung insbesondere für eine Wickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de découpage de feuilles en particulier pour une machine d'emballage

Publication

EP 1052209 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830271 A

Priority

EP 99830271 A

Abstract (en)

A foil cutting assembly, in particular for a wrapping machine, comprising: a fixed knife (28) and a rotating knife (22), having respective blades (44, 36) cooperating with each other, and adjustment means for varying the interference between the fixed knife (28) and the rotating knife (22). The fixed knife (28) is rotatably mounted about an axis (50) parallel to the axis of rotation of the rotating knife (22) and said adjustment means are provided for varying the angular operating position of the fixed knife (28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/08; B26D 1/38; B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/38 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01); B65H 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/265 (2013.01); B26D 1/385 (2013.01); B26D 7/2628 (2013.01); B65H 35/08 (2013.01); B65H 2402/60 (2013.01); B65H 2511/214 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052209 A1 20001115; EP 1052209 B1 20030319; DE 69906036 D1 20030424; DE 69906036 T2 20040122

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160506

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160506

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20160408

2016-04-08 [REG DE R231] PATENT ABANDONED FOR DE

- Document: DE 69906036

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150514

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906036 P 20030424

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000217

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI