Global Patent Index - EP 1052212 A1

EP 1052212 A1 2000-11-15 - Device for carrying out work in an elevator shaft

Title (en)

Device for carrying out work in an elevator shaft

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Ausführung von Arbeiten in einem Aufzugsschacht

Title (fr)

Equipement pour effectuer des travaux dans une cage d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1052212 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109499 A

Priority

  • EP 00109499 A
  • EP 99810429 A

Abstract (en)

The lift arrangement has a counter weight and a lift cabin (2) that can be moved with a maintenance platform (10). The roof the lift cabin serves as the maintenance platform. A maintenance operation safety device (13) ensures a specified distance (U) between the cabin roof (2.1) and the shaft ceiling (1.2) for the safety of the maintenance personnel and secures the lift cabin against any further u(upward movement.

Abstract (de)

Bei leerer Aufzugskabine (2) hat das Gegengewicht (3) gegenüber der Aufzugskabine (2) Übergewicht und kann sich bei gleichzeitigem Hochziehen der Aufzugskabine (2) nach unten bewegen. Ohne Sicherheitseinrichtung (13) besteht die Gefahr, dass sich das Gegengewicht (3) bis auf die Puffereinrichtung (12) absenkt und auf der Wartungsbühne befindliches Unterhaltspersonal (11) wegen des verkürzten Schachtkopfes (4) gefährdet. Mit der Sicherheitseinrichtung (13) wird der Weg des Gegengewichtes (3) auf einer Höhe begrenzt, dass die geforderte Überfahrt (Ü) zwischen Kabinendach (2.1) und Schachtdecke (1.2) in jedem Fall gewährleistet ist. Die Sicherheitseinrichtung (13) weist ein überwachtes, höhenverstellbares Auflager (13.1) auf, das beispielsweise mittels einer Spindel (13.2) höhenverstellbar ist. Die Spindel (13.2) wird von einem Motor (13.3) angetrieben und bei Wartungsbetrieb bis zur gezeigten Lage bewegt. Danach wird das Gegengewicht langsam auf das Auflager (13.1) abgesenkt. Die Aufzugskabine (2) ist nun gegen jede weitere Aufwärtsbewegung gesichert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 5/28; B66B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/28 (2006.01); B66B 15/06 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B66B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/288 (2013.01); B66B 5/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YA] US 5727657 A 19980317 - FOELIX HEINRICH [CH]
  • [YA] CH 667638 A5 19881031 - INVENTIO AG
  • [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 07 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 641 (M - 1516) 29 November 1993 (1993-11-29)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052212 A1 20001115; EP 1052212 B1 20050105; AT 286482 T 20050115; DE 50009150 D1 20050210; ES 2234474 T3 20050701; NO 20002195 A 20001115; NO 20002195 D0 20000427; NO 323028 B1 20061227; PT 1052212 E 20050429

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160502

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-11-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234474 T3

2005-05-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-05-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-04-20 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400971

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-04-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009150 P 20050210

2005-02-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030331

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI