Global Patent Index - EP 1052215 A2

EP 1052215 A2 2000-11-15 - Hydraulic lifting device

Title (en)

Hydraulic lifting device

Title (de)

Hydraulische Hubvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de levage hydraulique

Publication

EP 1052215 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108142 A

Priority

DE 19921629 A

Abstract (en)

The hydraulic lift device includes a control device for changing the lifting or lowering speed of the lift cylinder (13). Th control device has a measure sensor device (20) for detecting the lifting or lowering speed of the cylinder so that the speed of cylinder can be regulated by the speed of the motor (M) when the detected lift speed exceeds a first boundary value or the detec lowering speed exceeds a second boundary value. When the boundary values are understepped the speed of the lift cylinder can be regulated by the hydraulic oil volume flow in the supply or return pipeline. The supply line has a branch pipe through which during the load lifting operation hydraulic oil can be drawn off from the supply line. The branch pipe has a flow regulator valve used to change the volume flow of hydraulic fluid supplied to the cylinder.

Abstract (de)

Eine hydraulische Hubvorrichtung insbesondere für batteriegetriebene Flurförderzeuge umfaßt eine von einem Elektromotor (M) antreibbare Pumpe (P), mittels der im Lasthebebetrieb zumindest einem hydraulischen Hubzylinder (13) Hydrauliköl aus einem Vorratsbehälter (11) über eine Zuführleitung (L1,L4.1,L4.2) zuführbar ist, wobei das Hydrauliköl im Lastsenkbetrieb von dem Hubzylinder (13) über eine Rückführleitung (L4.1,L4.2,L1.3,L2,L1.1,L1.2,L6,L7,L5) unter Durchströmen eines den als Generator arbeitenden Elektromotor (M) antreibenden Hydromotors (P) in den Vorratsbehälter (11) zurückgefördert werden kann, und eine Steuervorrichtung zur Änderung der Hub- bzw. Senkgeschwindigkeit des Hubzylinders (13). Dabei ist vorgesehen, daß die Steuervorrichtung eine Maß-Sensorvorrichtung (20) zur Erfassung der Hub- bzw. Senkgeschwindigkeit des Hubzylinders (13) aufweist, wobei die Geschwindigkeit des Hubzylinders (13) mittels der Drehzahl des Motors (M) regelbar ist, wenn die erfaßte Hubgeschwindigkeit einen ersten Grenzwert (vHG) bzw. die erfaßte Senkgeschwindigkeit einen zweiten Grenzwert (vSG) überschreitet, und wobei die Geschwindigkeit des Hubzylinders (13) bei Unterschreiten der Grenzwerte mittels des Hydrauliköl-Volumenstroms in der Zuführ- bzw. Rückführleitung regelbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052215 A2 20001115; EP 1052215 A3 20050921; EP 1052215 B1 20120215; DE 19921629 A1 20001116; DE 19921629 B4 20050525

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160413

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160405

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150415

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150408

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-12-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20141113 AND 20141119

2014-07-09 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: S117

- Free Format Text: REQUEST FILED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 19 MARCH 2014

2014-04-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BT PRODUCTS AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50016204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120215

2014-04-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BT PRODUCTS AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50016204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140227

2014-04-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50016204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LICHTI PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140227

2014-04-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50016204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LICHTI - PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140227

2013-03-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 50016204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121116

2013-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20121116

2012-05-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2012-04-05 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 50016204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120405

2012-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2012-02-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071017

2006-06-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2006-01-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20051123

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-09-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-09-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 66F 9/22 A

2005-09-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 15B 21/14 B

2005-09-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 02F 9/22 B

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI