Global patent index - EP 1052287 A8

EP 1052287 A8 2001-04-04 - Complex for transferring an anionic substance of interest into a cell

Title (en)

Complex for transferring an anionic substance of interest into a cell

Title (de)

Komplex zur Übertragung von einem interessierenden anionischen Substanz auf einer Zelle

Title (fr)

Complexe pour le transfert d'une substance anionique d'intérêt dans une cellule

Publication

EP 1052287 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00401284 A

Priority

  • EP 00401284 A
  • EP 99401155 A
  • US 18721700 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052287A2] A complex for transferring an anionic substance of interest into a cell is disclosed that comprises: (i) at least a first polypeptide capable of binding to an anionic substance, (ii) a anionic substance of interest, wherein said first polypeptide comprises all or part of an amino acid sequence selected from the group consisting of the subunit amino acid sequences of the Cl complement factor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/87; A61K 47/42; A61K 47/44; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/11; C07K 14/47; C12N 15/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/11 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 15/87 (2006.01); C12N 15/88 (2006.01); A61K 47/42 (2006.01); A61K 47/44 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/88 (2013.01); C07K 14/472 (2013.01); C12N 15/87 (2013.01); A61K 47/42 (2013.01); A61K 47/44 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052287 A2 20001115; EP 1052287 A8 20010404

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JACOBS, ERIC

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BOMPARD, ALBINE

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VAUTIER, DOMINIQUE

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI