Global Patent Index - EP 1052310 A2

EP 1052310 A2 2000-11-15 - Process and apparatus for enamelling the surface of a steel object

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for enamelling the surface of a steel object

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Emaillierung der Oberfläche eines Stahlkörpers

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareillage pour émailler la surface d'objets en acier

Publication

EP 1052310 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250102 A

Priority

DE 19922945 A

Abstract (en)

Direct enameling comprises steel surface decarburization and immediate direct enamel layer application. An Independent claim is also included for apparatus for carrying out the above steel enameling process.

Abstract (de)

Um zur Emaillierung der Oberfläche eines Stahlkörpers, insbesondere einer Rohraußenoberfläche, durch Direktemaillierung, eine hohe Lebensdauer des Stahlkörpers in hochkorrosiven Umgebungen sowie eine einfache Herstellung der Emaillierung zu ermöglichen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß zu emaillierende Oberflächenbereiche des Stahlkörpers einer Randentkohlung unterzogen werden, worauf mindestens eine Schicht aus Direktemail aufgebracht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23D 5/00; C21D 3/04; C23D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 3/04 (2006.01); C23D 3/00 (2006.01); C23D 5/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23D 5/00 (2013.01); C21D 3/04 (2013.01); C23D 3/00 (2013.01); C23D 5/005 (2013.01); C21D 9/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052310 A2 20001115; EP 1052310 A3 20040811; DE 19922945 A1 20001116; DE 19922945 C2 20031030

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-07 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20050212

2005-11-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010321

2005-06-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-05-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EHW THALE EMAIL GMBH

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI