Global Patent Index - EP 1052323 A2

EP 1052323 A2 2000-11-15 - Needle for sewing machine with slender eye

Title (en)

Needle for sewing machine with slender eye

Title (de)

Nähmaschinennadel mit schlankem Öhr

Title (fr)

Aiguille de machine à coudre à chas mince

Publication

EP 1052323 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106097 A

Priority

DE 19921913 A

Abstract (en)

The sewing machine needle (1) has a narrow eye (18) which transits directly into a thread groove on the needle shaft. The ey (18) has an indentation (26) at the side with the thread groove (9) for a smaller cross section and reduced stress on the thread penetrating the fabric while stitching. The walls at the transit between the thread groove (9) and the eye (18) are sufficiently high from the groove base so that the sewing thread is not exposed, and is effectively held clear of the fabric workpiece. The walls of the needle eye have a total height, at least at one point (26) which is less than the height of a zone (27) between the needle point (3) and the eye (18). The eye walls have a constant height, at the indentation (26), with an increase at the en the indentation section. The indentation (26) has a constant radius (R), with a center (M) of the curvature pref. on a straight extension of the eye (18). The radius (R) is equal to two or three times the nominal needle thickness. The eye walls at the oppo sides to the indentation (26) are generally straight, and the eye walls against the indentation (26) are thicker than the walls the other side. The needle shaft (2) has a thread groove (9), which opens into the eye (18). The eye walls, at the transit betwe the thread groove (9) and the eye (18), define the transit zone, and they are straight and parallel to each other. The shaft (2) a hollowed neck (15), with a zone (14) offset to one side at it. The eye (18) is defined by rounded straps (23,29) on the center axis (4), with a rounding radius pref. equal to one-half the strap (23) thickness. The eye straps (23,29) are offset by a gap ac the center axis (4) which is at least 40% of the nominal needle thickness, and pref. 50%, measured at the unweakened zones of th needle shaft (2). Measured across the center axis (4), the straps (23,29) have a thickness of at least 40% of the nominal needle thickness and pref. 50%. The passage through the eye (18), between the straps (23,29) is on a straight line at an acute angle of 20 degrees to the center axis (4). At least one eye strap (29) has a concave base surface (31) on the side towards the sewi thread. The eye (18) has a length, along the center axis (4), which is less than twice the needle width of the unweakened shaft across the center axis (4), and pref. 1.5 times. The needle (1) height at the eye (18), across the center axis (4) and on the li into the eye (18), is less than the nominal needle thickness.

Abstract (de)

Eine insbesondere für hohe Arbeitsgeschwindigkeiten eingerichtete Nähmaschinennadel (1) weist ein schlankes Öhr (18) auf, das unmittelbar in eine über den Schaft laufende Fadenrinne übergeht. An der Seite der Fadenrinne (9) ist das Öhr mit einer Einbuchtung (26) versehen, die zu einem geringen Öhrquerschnitt und somit zu einer geringen Nahtgutbelastung beim Einstichvorgang führt. In dem Übergangsbereich von der Fadenrinne (9) zu dem Öhr (18) sind die diesen Bereich hier begrenzenden Wände gemessen vom Boden der Fadenrinne so hoch, dass der Nähzwirn (32) nicht exponiert wird und somit von dem Nähgut wirksam ferngehalten wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 85/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 85/02 (2006.01); D05B 85/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 85/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052323 A2 20001115; EP 1052323 A3 20010516; EP 1052323 B1 20031210; DE 19921913 A1 20001207; DE 19921913 C2 20010613; ES 2211403 T3 20040716; JP 2000325685 A 20001128; JP 3999441 B2 20071031; US 6332417 B1 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50004695

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150424

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140330

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140330

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140330

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211403 T3

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004695 P 20040122

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI