Global Patent Index - EP 1052324 A2

EP 1052324 A2 2000-11-15 - Sewing machine needle with offset eye lips

Title (en)

Sewing machine needle with offset eye lips

Title (de)

Nähmaschinennadel mit versetzten Öhrstegen

Title (fr)

Aiguille de machine à coudre avec chas à lèvres décalées

Publication

EP 1052324 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106098 A

Priority

DE 19921914 A

Abstract (en)

The sewing machine needle (1) has an eye (11) which is defined by two spaced straps (12,14) offset against each other across needle center axis (4). The eye straps (12,14) are rounded, with a rounding radius pref. equal to one-half the thickness of the eye straps (12,14). offset gap between the eye straps (12,14) is at least 40% of the nominal needle thickness, and pref. 50%. The needle eye straps (12,14) each have a transit zone (15,18) between their rounded ends and a base surface (16,17) towards the sewing thread, on the center axis (4). The passage through the needle eye (11) is a straight line past the surfaces (16,17) on the thread side, at an acute angle of 20 degrees to the center axis (4). At least one eye strap surface (16,17), and pref. both, is concave toward the sewing thread. The length of the needle eye (11), along the center axis (4), is less than twice the nominal needle thickness and pref. 1.0-1.1 times. Each eye strap (12,14) is defined by a thread groove (21,32) at the surface on the thread side. The eye walls have inner surfaces, with an axial sections between them at different angles. The needle (1) height, measured at the eye ( at right angles to the center axis (4), is less than the needle thickness. The eye strap (12), between the eye and the needle clamping section, has walls which do not project over the sides of the strap (12).

Abstract (de)

Die Nähmaschinennadel (1) weist ein in Axialrichtung von zwei Öhrstegen (12, 14) begrenztes Öhr (11) auf, das in Axialrichtung (Mittelachse (4)) relativ kurz ausgebildet ist. Seine Länge ist nicht wesentlich größer als die Nominalstärke der Nähmaschinennadel (1). Die Öhrstege (12, 14) sind gegeneinander versetzt, wobei jeder Öhrsteg (12, 14) etwa halb so dick ist, wie die Nähmaschinennadel (1) im Bereich des Öhrs (11). Somit wird eine stabile und schlanke Nähmaschinennadel (1) geschaffen, die aufgrund ihrer Schlankheit Einstichlöcher relativ langsam öffnet und somit auch bei sehr hohen Stichzahlen schonend näht und dabei einen nahezu voll geschützten Fadenlauf ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 85/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 85/02 (2006.01); D05B 85/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 85/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052324 A2 20001115; EP 1052324 A3 20010516; EP 1052324 B1 20060607; DE 19921914 A1 20001207; DE 19921914 C2 20011025; DE 50012884 D1 20060720; ES 2261113 T3 20061116; JP 2000325684 A 20001128; US 6318280 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012884

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130330

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130330

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130330

2013-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2006-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2261113 T3

2006-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061023

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012884 P 20060720

2006-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2006-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI