Global patent index - EP 1052327 A1

EP 1052327 A1 2000-11-15 - White water circuit and process for the circulation of water in a papermachine

Title (en)

White water circuit and process for the circulation of water in a papermachine

Title (de)

Siebwasserkreislauf und Verfahren zur Wasserzirkulation einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Circuit d' eau blanche et procédé de circulation de l' eau dans une machine à papier

Publication

EP 1052327 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108222 A

Priority

DE 19922391 A

Abstract (en)

The water circuit system, at the fourdrinier section of a papermaking machine, is linked to an applicator where a mass is applied to the wet paper web containing a pigment and/or filling materials. An initial water circuit is fed exclusively by the sections (2.1,2.2) which extract water from the wet web in the web production process, before the wet web is coated with a mass. Part of the extracted water, in a second water circuit, is used to feed the web applicator, and the remainder is cleaned of contained matter pref. in a micro-filtration station (7). A thickening stage (6) is in front of the micro-filtration unit (7). P of the water for the applicator is taken from the overflow at the thickening stage (6) and/or from the micro-filter (7). An Independent claim is included for the operation of a water circuit at the fourdrinier section of a papermaking machine, where only water which is wholly clean of pigments and/or filling materials is returned to the stock inlet (1). Preferred Features: Only water which carries pigments and/or filling materials is passed to the applicator. Unused water, w carries matter, is cleaned by micro-filtration (7) after thickening (6) to give a clear water output.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Siebwasserkreislauf einer Papiermaschine, welche mindestens eine Auftragsvorrichtung zur Applikation einer pigment- und/oder füllstoffhaltigen Masse auf eine noch nicht fertig entwässerte Faserbahn im Naßbereich aufweist, welche weiterhin mit einem ersten Siebwasserkreislauf, der einen Stoffauflauf mit Siebwasser versorgt, und weiterhin einem zweiten Siebwasserkreislauf, der den Rest des Siebwassers aufnimmt, ausgestattet ist. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der erste Siebwasserkreislauf ausschließlich durch Entwässerungselemente (2.1, 2.2) gespeist wird, die im Herstellungsprozeß vor der Applikation der pigment- und/oder füllstoffhaltigen Masse angeordnet sind. Weiterhin betrifft die Erfindung ein Verfahren zur Wasserzirkulation einer Papiermaschine mit einem Naßteil, in welchem einer entstehenden Faserbahn auf mindestens eine Oberfläche eine pigment- und/oder füllstoffhaltige Masse appliziert und der sich bildenden Faserbahn Siebwasser entzogen wird. Das Verfahren ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß ausschließlich das Siebwasser, welches nicht mit Pigmenten und/oder Füllstoffen aus der Pigment- und/oder Füllstoffapplikation belastet ist, dem Stoffauflauf (1) zugeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/66; D21H 23/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/66 (2006.01); D21H 23/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/28 (2013.01); D21F 1/66 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052327 A1 20001115; EP 1052327 B1 20040721; AT 271627 T 20040815; DE 19922391 A1 20001116; US 6497788 B1 20021224

INPADOC legal status

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120415

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50007102

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120414

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120414

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 271627

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120414

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007102

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030425

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI