Global Patent Index - EP 1052328 A2

EP 1052328 A2 2000-11-15 - Production method for gravure paper

Title (en)

Production method for gravure paper

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren für ein Tiefdruck-Papier

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication du papier hélio

Publication

EP 1052328 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102731 A

Priority

DE 19922390 A

Abstract (en)

In the prodn. of paper for gravure printing, with a max. roughness depth of 1.4 mu m, a fiber suspension is prepared with a Canadian Standard Freeness (CSF) rating of 50 ml CSF and pref. 50-120 ml CSF. The suspension is converted into a paper web the web formation stage of a papermaking machine, followed by a water extraction press station and a drying stage. A slurry is applied to the unfinished paper web, containing pigments and/or filling materials, between the start of web formation and a dry content of the paper of 90%. The slurry has a fiber content of 2-60% and pref. 5-30%. The paper requires no further coating The web passes through a press station after the slurry application, which is on both sides of the web. At least one slurry coating is applied at the web formation stage and/or at the press station. At least one slurry coating is applied to the paper w with a dry content of 55% and pref. 3-55%. The slurry coating is applied to the web through a screen in a dry mass weight f at least one coating on one side of the web of 0.5-10.0 g/m<2> and pref. 1.0-10.0 g/m<2>. The slurry containing pigments and/or filling materials is prepared with a fiber content of pref. 10-95% and especially 20-60%. The fiber web (4.1) is formed from the stock inlet (1) with at least two and pref. three layers. One layer, and pref. the two outer layers (4.2,4.3) ar wholly of the pigment/filling material slurry and at least one layer (4.1) and pref. the center layer is of the paper fiber pulp The web is passed through a web formation stage, a press station and a drying section, without further surface coating. The slur contains kaolin, clay, ground CaCO3, precipitated CaCO3, TiO2, talcum and bentonite. It also contains a retention agent, fixing agents, dispersion agents, adhesive glue agents, bonding agents and a fine matter suspension. The pigment/filling material slurry has a fiber content with a rating of 30 ml CSF and pref. 20 ml CSF. The fiber content the outer pigment/filling material layers is 50-100% less than the fiber content of the center layer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Herstellungsverfahren für ein Tiefdruck-Papier mit einer maximalen Rauhtiefe von 1.40µm. Weiterhin betrifft die Erfindung ein Tiefdruck-Papier, welches in einem einzigen Arbeitsgang hergestellt wird. Das Herstellungsverfahren zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß ein mehrschichtiges Papier erzeugt wird, dessen zu bedruckende Schichten im wesentlichen durch ein Pigment- und/oder Füllstoffslurry gebildet werden, während die nicht zu bedruckende Schicht aus einer Stoffsuspension hergestellt wird, deren Stoff einen Mahlgrad mit einer Freeness größer/gleich 50 ml CSF aufweist, wobei auf ein nachträgliches Streichen zur Oberflächenverbesserung wird verzichtet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/04 (2006.01); D21H 19/84 (2006.01); D21H 23/28 (2006.01); D21H 23/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/006 (2013.01); D21F 11/04 (2013.01); D21H 19/84 (2013.01); D21H 23/28 (2013.01); D21H 23/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052328 A2 20001115; EP 1052328 A3 20010404; EP 1052328 B1 20060927; AT 340895 T 20061015; DE 19922390 A1 20001116; DE 50013508 D1 20061109; US 6423181 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110211

2012-01-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013508

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100215

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070628

2007-01-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013508 P 20061109

2006-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-04-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRODUCTION METHOD FOR GRAVURE PAPER

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI