Global patent index - EP 1052328 A3

EP 1052328 A3 2001-04-04 - Gravure paper and a method for its production

Title (en)

Gravure paper and a method for its production

Title (de)

Tiefdruck-Papier und Herstellungsverfahren für dieses Papier

Title (fr)

Papier hélio et un procédé pour la fabrication du même

Publication

EP 1052328 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102731 A

Priority

DE 19922390 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052328A2] In the prodn. of paper for gravure printing, with a max. roughness depth of 1.4 mu m, a fiber suspension is prepared with a Canadian Standard Freeness (CSF) rating of 50 ml CSF and pref. 50-120 ml CSF. The suspension is converted into a paper web the web formation stage of a papermaking machine, followed by a water extraction press station and a drying stage. A slurry is applied to the unfinished paper web, containing pigments and/or filling materials, between the start of web formation and a dry content of the paper of 90%. The slurry has a fiber content of 2-60% and pref. 5-30%. The paper requires no further coating The web passes through a press station after the slurry application, which is on both sides of the web. At least one slurry coating is applied at the web formation stage and/or at the press station. At least one slurry coating is applied to the paper w with a dry content of 55% and pref. 3-55%. The slurry coating is applied to the web through a screen in a dry mass weight f at least one coating on one side of the web of 0.5-10.0 g/m<2> and pref. 1.0-10.0 g/m<2>. The slurry containing pigments and/or filling materials is prepared with a fiber content of pref. 10-95% and especially 20-60%. The fiber web (4.1) is formed from the stock inlet (1) with at least two and pref. three layers. One layer, and pref. the two outer layers (4.2,4.3) ar wholly of the pigment/filling material slurry and at least one layer (4.1) and pref. the center layer is of the paper fiber pulp The web is passed through a web formation stage, a press station and a drying section, without further surface coating. The slur contains kaolin, clay, ground CaCO3, precipitated CaCO3, TiO2, talcum and bentonite. It also contains a retention agent, fixing agents, dispersion agents, adhesive glue agents, bonding agents and a fine matter suspension. The pigment/filling material slurry has a fiber content with a rating of 30 ml CSF and pref. 20 ml CSF. The fiber content the outer pigment/filling material layers is 50-100% less than the fiber content of the center layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/04 (2006.01); D21H 19/84 (2006.01); D21H 23/28 (2006.01); D21H 23/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/006 (2013.01); D21F 11/04 (2013.01); D21H 19/84 (2013.01); D21H 23/28 (2013.01); D21H 23/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052328 A2 20001115; EP 1052328 A3 20010404; EP 1052328 B1 20060927; AT 340895 T 20061015; DE 19922390 A1 20001116; DE 50013508 D1 20061109; US 6423181 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110211

2012-01-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50013508

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100215

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070628

2007-01-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50013508

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-11-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-04-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PRODUCTION METHOD FOR GRAVURE PAPER

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI