Global Patent Index - EP 1052330 A2

EP 1052330 A2 2000-11-15 - Rail arrangement with support for the tongue-blade of a switch

Title (en)

Rail arrangement with support for the tongue-blade of a switch

Title (de)

Schienenanordnung mit Abstützung für eine Zungenschiene

Title (fr)

Ensemble de voie ferrée avec support pour la lame d'une aiguille

Publication

EP 1052330 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110040 A

Priority

DE 19922211 A

Abstract (en)

The support mounting for a tongue rail (12) at a railway permanent way, for setting against the switch rail (10) and especia at direction change points, is a roller unit (28) which projects from a holder (26) which extends through the second fixed rail (14). The holder (26) is an angle unit which is generally parallel to the movement path of the switch rail (10). One leg (34) ha roller unit (28) and the other leg (36), at an angle to the first, is along the side (20) of the fixed rail (14) away from the switch rail (10), at least in sections.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Abstützung für eine Zungenschiene (12), die zu einer Backenschiene (10) verstellbar ist. Die Zungenschiene ist auf einem Rollenelement (28) abstützbar, das seinerseits von einer Halterung (26) ausgeht, die die Backenschiene durchsetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052330 A2 20001115; EP 1052330 A3 20030326; DE 19922211 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051216

2005-08-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: RAIL ARRANGEMENT WITH SUPPORT FOR THE TONGUE-BLADE OF A SWITCH

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050314

2003-12-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

LT

- Payment date: 20030423

2003-12-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

LV

- Payment date: 20030423

2003-12-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

RO

- Payment date: 20030423

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BWG GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BWG GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BWG GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI