Global patent index - EP 1052333 A1

EP 1052333 A1 2000-11-15 - Reduced noise elastic pavement material and method of application thereof

Title (en)

Reduced noise elastic pavement material and method of application thereof

Title (de)

Geräuschgedämpftes elastisches Strassendeckenmaterial und Verfahren zur Anwendung desselben

Title (fr)

Matériau de pavage élastique à bruit réduit et méthode pour l'appliquer

Publication

EP 1052333 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00109166 A

Priority

JP 12956199 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is a reduced noise elastic pavement material which is applied to roadways and has a noise reducing effect and a vibration reducing effect due to elasticity, air permeability, and sound absorption. The reduced noise elastic pavement material has a structure in which a hard aggregate and an elastic aggregate are bonded together by a urethane binder. More specifically, the reduced noise elastic pavement material is formed by a hard aggregate, an elastic aggregate, and a urethane binder which bonds the hard aggregate and the elastic aggregate together, in which the hard aggregate is 10 to 75 % by volume of a total volume of the hard aggregate and the elastic aggregate, and a two-component urethane binder is used as the urethane binder. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 7/30; E01C 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08K 3/00 (2006.01); C08L 21/00 (2006.01); C08L 75/04 (2006.01); E01C 7/30 (2006.01); E01C 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 7/30 (2013.01); E01C 13/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052333 A1 20001115; JP 2000319501 A 20001121; JP 4357029 B2 20091104

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030313

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI