Global patent index - EP 1052339 A2

EP 1052339 A2 2000-11-15 - Masonry block for the erection of wall without grout joints and wall anchor therefor

Title (en)

Masonry block for the erection of wall without grout joints and wall anchor therefor

Title (de)

Mauerblock zum Mauern von mörtelfugenfreien Wänden sowie Maueranker hierfür

Title (fr)

Bloc de maçonnerie pour la construction de murs sans joints de mortier et ancrage mural correspondant

Publication

EP 1052339 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109889 A

Priority

DE 19921873 A

Abstract (en)

The building block has on the top side stud-like projections and on the underneath matching indentations. On the top and/or bottom side there is at least one groove (7) which runs from a side edge (6) to an indentation (8) and is designed to hold a building tie (22). Independent claim describes building tie for connecting building block which has an oblong tie section with at one end a section fixable on a third object. An abutment (27) which can be inserted into an indentation provided on the building block is mounted longitudinally movable and lockable on the oblong tie section.

Abstract (de)

Mauerblock zum Mauern von mörtelfugenfreien Wänden o.dgl., mit oberseitigen noppenartigen Vorsprüngen und unterseitig vorgesehenen, der Form der oberseitigen Vorsprünge angepassten Vertiefungen, wobei ober- und/oder unterseitig wenigstens eine von einer Seitenkante zu einer Eintiefung führende Nut zur Aufnahme eines Mauerankers vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/14; E04B 1/41; E04B 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/41 (2006.01); E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 2/16 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/16 (2013.01); E04B 1/4185 (2013.01); E04B 1/7616 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0221 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19639136 A1 19970605 - BADEN STEFFEN [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052339 A2 20001115; EP 1052339 A3 20011107; DE 19921873 A1 20001130

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-08-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI