Global Patent Index - EP 1052340 A2

EP 1052340 A2 2000-11-15 - Facade construction with mullion and transom profiles

Title (en)

Facade construction with mullion and transom profiles

Title (de)

Fassadenkonstruktion mit Pfosten- sowie Riegelprofilen

Title (fr)

Construction de façade avec des profilés de montants et de traverses

Publication

EP 1052340 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109969 A

Priority

DE 29908377 U

Abstract (en)

The post and brace profiles (1,2) are fitted together by butt connectors (5) fixed on the post profile. An articulated beari area is provided in the connecting area of the connector and brace section (2) between the post profile and fixing point of the brace section on the connector so that when fitting the brace section on the connector it is possible to produce torque for the brace section relative to the post profile so that the cut face of the brace section during assembly is placed with tension agai the outside of the post profile to avoid any gaps

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Fassadenkonstruktion mit Pfostenprofilen 1 sowie Riegelprofilen 2 zur Bildung eines Rahmenwerks zur Aufnahme von plattenförmigen Elementen, wie z.B. Glasscheiben oder Fassadenplatten, mit Nuten 3, 4 zur Aufnahme von Dichtungsleisten sowie einem Stoßverbinder 5 zur Herstellung einer Stoßverbindung zwischen Pfostenprofil 1 sowie Riegelprofil 2, wobei der Stoßverbinder 5 am Pfostenprofil 1 befestigt wird und die Befestigung des Riegelprofils 2 am Stoßverbinder 5 erfolgt, wobei im Bereich der Verbindung von Stoßverbinder 5 und Riegelprofil 2 zwischen dem Pfostenprofil 1 und dem Punkt der Befestigung des Riegelprofils 2 am Stoßverbinder 5 ein gelenkartiger Auflagebereich vorgesehen ist, derart, daß bei Montage des Riegelprofils 2 am Stoßverbinder 5 ein Drehmoment des Riegelprofils 2 zum Pfostenprofil 1 erzeugbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/965 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0162227 B1 19910206

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908377 U1 19990729; AT 338858 T 20060915; DE 50013418 D1 20061019; EP 1052340 A2 20001115; EP 1052340 A3 20021113; EP 1052340 B1 20060906

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 338858 T

- Effective date: 20160425

2016-07-13 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20160425

2016-04-25 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50013418

2016-04-25 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 50013418

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120511

2013-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 338858 T

- Effective date: 20120511

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GUTMANN AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HERMANN GUTMANN WERKE GMBH, 91781 WEISSENBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50013418

- Effective date: 20110311

2010-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2010-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GUTMANN AG

- Free text: HERMANN GUTMANN WERKE GMBH#NUERNBERGER STRASSE 57-81#91781 WEISSENBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GUTMANN AG#NUERNBERGER STRASSE 57#91781 WEISSENBURG (DE)

2007-07-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHUECO INTERNATIONAL KG

- Effective date: 20070606

2006-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013418 P 20061019

2006-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRANK, HERMANN

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUBERT, FRANK

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRANK, HERMANN

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUBERT, FRANK

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI