Global Patent Index - EP 1052341 A1

EP 1052341 A1 2000-11-15 - Insulation system

Title (en)

Insulation system

Title (de)

Dämmsystem

Title (fr)

Système isolant

Publication

EP 1052341 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890152 A

Priority

AT 33299 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052338A2] The insulating plate has along two or more side faces tongued and grooved profiles. In thickness it is in two parts with the base part (1) having at least one groove (31) on its cover surface (30) in which a tongued counter strip (42) on the underneath of a cover part (40) engages. The cover part has on its side away from the base part a coated surface (44). Several parallel grooves forming air channels be provided in one of the adjoining faces of the base and cover parts

Abstract (de)

Dämmsystem für einen Gebäudekörper mit im wesentlichen rechteckigen Dämmplatten (1), die an den im montierten Zustand parallel zur Traufe des Gebäudekörpers verlaufenden Stirnseiten (4, 5) mit gegengleichen nut- und federartig ineinandergreifenden Profilierungen (2, 3) versehen sind und eine Profilierung zur Aufnahme einer Leiste (10, 10', 10") zur Halterung einer Verkleidung aufweisen, welche Leiste (10, 10', 10") einen Abschnitt (14, 24, 24') aufweist, an dem die Verkleidung befestigbar ist. Um eine einfache Montage der Dämmplatten (1) zu ermöglichen, ist vorgesehen, daß an den übrigen Stirnseiten (4', 5') der Dämmplatten (1) gegengleiche nut- und federartig Profilierungen (2', 3') vorgesehen sind und an einer Stirnseite (5) zusätzlich eine Profilierung (12) vorgesehen ist, die einen Freiraum begrenzt, in den die Leisten (10, 10', 10") zur Halterung der Verkleidung einsetzbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 7/22 (2006.01); E04D 3/35 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/225 (2013.01); E04B 1/762 (2013.01); E04D 3/351 (2013.01); E04F 13/0826 (2013.01); E04F 13/0869 (2013.01); E04F 13/0876 (2013.01); E04F 13/0878 (2013.01); E04F 2203/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0007401 A1 19800206 - IBM [US]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052338 A2 20001115; EP 1052338 A3 20021211; AT 3882 U1 20000925; EP 1052341 A1 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031120

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI